EP2320478 - Installation module for solar panels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sauvageon, Denis Les Belles Rives, Boîte 51 2 rue Barrier 73100 LeGrand Port d'Aix Les Bains / FR | [2011/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sauvageon, Denis Les Belles Rives Boîte 51, 2 rue Barrier 73100 Le Grand Port d'Aix Les Bains / FR | [2011/19] | Representative(s) | de Jong, Jean Jacques, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/19] | de Jong, Jean Jacques, et al Cabinet Hecké 10, rue d'Arménie Europole BP 1537 38025 Grenoble Cedex 1 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10354068.8 | 26.10.2010 | [2011/19] | Priority number, date | FR20090005268 | 03.11.2009 Original published format: FR 0905268 | [2011/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2320478 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/042 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
H02S20/23 (EP);
F24S25/40 (EP);
F24S2020/13 (EP);
F24S2025/6002 (EP);
Y02B10/10 (EP);
Y02E10/47 (EP);
Y02E10/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einbaumodule für Fotovoltaikpaneele | [2011/19] | English: | Installation module for solar panels | [2011/19] | French: | Module de pose pour panneaux solaires | [2011/19] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH02280387 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [Y] 6,7 * the whole document *; | [IY]US2005217716 (MASUDA HIROTO [JP], et al) [I] 1-5 * figure 6 * [Y] 6,7; | [A]EP2012365 (TERREAL [FR]) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |