EP2206869 - Device for motorising a window or a bay with sliding frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deprat Jean SA Société Anonyme 24 Rue de la Papinerie ZI Roubaix Est 59115 Leers / FR | [2010/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castell, Mathias c/o Deprat Jean SA 24 rue de la Papinerie ZI Roubaix Est 59115 Leers / FR | 02 /
Kimpe, Florent c/o Deprat Jean SA 24 rue de la Papinerie ZI Roubaix Est 59115 Leers / FR | [2010/28] | Representative(s) | Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 31, rue des Poissonceaux CS 40009 59044 Lille Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Boubal, Denis Henri Jacques, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/28] | Duthoit, Michel Georges André, et al Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 96/98, Boulevard Carnot B.P. 105 59027 Lille Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 10370003.5 | 08.01.2010 | [2010/28] | Priority number, date | FR20090000073 | 09.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0900073 | [2010/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2206869 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2206869 | Date: | 13.04.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/14 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
E05F15/635 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/40 (EP);
E05Y2600/626 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/28] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung für die Motorisierung eines Fensters oder des Öffnungselements eines Schiebefensters | [2010/28] | English: | Device for motorising a window or a bay with sliding frame | [2010/28] | French: | Dispositif pour la motorisation d'une fenêtre ou d'une baie à châssis coulissant | [2010/28] | Examination procedure | 09.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2010 | AT | 13.04.2011 | CY | 13.04.2011 | CZ | 13.04.2011 | DK | 13.04.2011 | EE | 13.04.2011 | FI | 13.04.2011 | HR | 13.04.2011 | IE | 13.04.2011 | IT | 13.04.2011 | LT | 13.04.2011 | LV | 13.04.2011 | MK | 13.04.2011 | MT | 13.04.2011 | NL | 13.04.2011 | PL | 13.04.2011 | RO | 13.04.2011 | SE | 13.04.2011 | SI | 13.04.2011 | SK | 13.04.2011 | SM | 13.04.2011 | TR | 13.04.2011 | BG | 13.07.2011 | NO | 13.07.2011 | GR | 14.07.2011 | ES | 24.07.2011 | IS | 13.08.2011 | PT | 16.08.2011 | LU | 08.01.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
SM | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
LU | 08.01.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
TR | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
MT | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 13.07.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
MK | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
IT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2011 | ||
DK | 13.04.2011 | ||
EE | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
IE | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
PL | 13.04.2011 | ||
RO | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
SK | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
NL | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 13.04.2011 | |
CY | 13.04.2011 | ||
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
LV | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
SI | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
IS | 13.08.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 13.04.2011 | |
FI | 13.04.2011 | ||
LT | 13.04.2011 | ||
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
GR | 14.07.2011 | ||
ES | 24.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
SE | 13.04.2011 | ||
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 13.04.2011 | |
NO | 13.07.2011 | ||
PT | 16.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2752871 (LEGOFF JOSEPH [FR]) [AD] 1,10* page 3, line 22 - line 29; figure 2 *; | [AD]EP1325996 (BERTOLUS ANNE [FR], et al) [AD] 1,12 * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0011] , [0013] , [0022] , [0023]; figures 1-4 *; | FR2834530 [ ] (BERTOLUS ANNE [FR], et al); | [A]EP1672151 (HAMADA KOUSYOU CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,5 * figure 6; compound 32 * | by applicant | FR2664644 | FR2752871 | FR2834530 |