EP2241709 - Simultaneous displacement device for sliding doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KLEIN IBÉRICA, S.A. Polígono Industrial Can Cuyás Ctra. N-150 a Sabadell, Km.1 Edificio Klein 08110 Montcada i Reixac (Barcelona) / ES | [2010/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarrega Lloret, Miguel Angel Nena Casas, 20-22 08017 Barcelona / ES | [2010/42] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. c/ Goya, 11 28001 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2010/42] | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & C Goya 11 28001 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10380056.1 | 15.04.2010 | [2010/42] | Priority number, date | ES20090000999 | 16.04.2009 Original published format: ES 200900999 | [2010/42] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2241709 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2241709 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | [2010/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2241709 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/14, E05F17/00 | [2010/42] | CPC: |
E05F17/004 (EP,ES,US);
E05F15/643 (EP,ES,US);
E05F17/002 (EP,ES,US);
E05D15/08 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/216 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/62 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/42] | Extension states | AL | 05.04.2011 | BA | 05.04.2011 | ME | 05.04.2011 | RS | 05.04.2011 | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur gleichzeitigen Bewegung von Schiebetüren | [2010/42] | English: | Simultaneous displacement device for sliding doors | [2010/42] | French: | Dispositif de déplacement simultané pour portes coulissantes | [2010/42] | Examination procedure | 05.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/20] | 09.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 23.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | EE | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | MK | 05.12.2012 | MT | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | SM | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | GR | 06.03.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | CY | 15.04.2013 | LU | 15.04.2013 | HR | 29.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MK | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
CY | 15.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
SM | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
CY | 15.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/13] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
MT | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
CY | 15.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
CY | 15.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
CY | 10.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/01] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
HR | 29.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | EE | 05.12.2012 | |
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | GR | 06.03.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4781270 (HOLLAND GORDON A [US]); | [A]DE9416316U (PODELWITZ STAHLBAU GMBH [DE]); | [A]US6352097 (KERN RODNEY [US], et al); | [A]EP1544399 (KLEIN IBERICA [ES]) |