EP2251520 - Attachment element for the assembly of a subframe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kriket Armazones S.L. Poligono Torrelarragoiti, Parcela 5-D 48170 Zamudio Vizcaya / ES | [2010/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ibarrondo Medina, Alberto Poligono Torrelarragoiti, Parcela 5-D 48170 Zamudio Vizcaya / ES | [2010/46] | Representative(s) | De Pablos Riba, Julio Los Madrazo, 24 28014 Madrid / ES | [2010/46] | Application number, filing date | 10380058.7 | 21.04.2010 | [2010/46] | Priority number, date | ES20090030091P | 13.05.2009 Original published format: ES 200930091 P | [2010/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2251520 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2251520 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/964, F16B21/02, F16B5/10, F16B21/08, // E06B3/984 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
E06B3/9642 (EP);
F16B21/02 (EP);
F16B21/086 (EP);
F16B21/088 (EP);
F16B5/10 (EP);
E06B3/984 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | E06B3/964, F16B21/02 | ||
Former IPC [2010/46] | E06B3/964 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2010/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Befestigungselement zum Zusammenbau eines Hilfsrahmens | [2010/46] | English: | Attachment element for the assembly of a subframe | [2010/46] | French: | Elément de fixation servant à assembler un cadre auxiliaire | [2010/46] | Examination procedure | 28.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/46] | 13.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 29.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1477591 (CAPELLE, M. R.) [A] 1 * the whole document * * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2007258795 (NAKAZATO HIROSHI [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]FR2144552 (FILDIER) [A] 1 * figures 1,2,4,5 * |