EP2394653 - Topical pharmaceutical compositions comprising mometasone furoate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Almirall, S.A. Ronda General Mitre 151 08022 Barcelona / ES | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Ricarda M / Scholtzstrasse 3 21465, Reinbek / DE | 02 /
Evers, Fritjof / Scholtzstrasse 3 Reinbek, 21465 / DE | 03 /
Mallwitz, Henning / Scholtzstrasse 3 21465, Reinbek / DE | 04 /
Willers, Christoph / Scholtzstrasse 3 21465, Reinbek / DE | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu, S.A. Patent Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto Elzaburu, S.A. Patent Miguel Angel, 21 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10382146.8 | 26.05.2010 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394653 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/58, A61K47/06, A61K47/10, A61K9/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
A61K31/58 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/107 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Topische pharmazeutische Zusammensetzungen enthaltend Mometasonfuroat | [2011/50] | English: | Topical pharmaceutical compositions comprising mometasone furoate | [2011/50] | French: | Compositions pharmaceutiques topiques contenant du furoate de mométasone | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/50] | 23.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4808610 (MUNAYYER FARAH J [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 14 * * examples 1-4 ** claims 1-6 *; | [ID]EP1886686 (HERMAL KURT HERMANN GMBH & CO [DE]) [ID] 1-14 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0036] * * examples 1-12 * * claims 1-21 *; | [ID]WO2008126076 (PERRIGO ISRAEL PHARMACEUTICALS [IL], et al) [ID] 1-14 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0040]; examples 1-6 * * tables 1-3 * * claims 1-5,7-9,16,17,22-29,43-45 * | by applicant | US4775529 | US4808610 | WO9108733 | WO2004105686 | EP1886686 | WO2008126076 | - MCKENZIE A.W.; STOUGHTON R.B., "Method for comparing percutaneous absorption of steroids", ARCH DERMATOL, (1962), vol. 86, pages 608 - 610 | - MCKENZIE; STOUGHTON, ARCH. DERMATOL., (1962), vol. 86, pages 608 - 610 | - DUMAS; SCHOLTZ, ACTA DERMATOVENER (STOCKH), (1972), vol. 52, pages 43 - 48 |