EP2394663 - Compositions for injectable in-situ biodegradable implants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.06.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.01.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LABORATORIOS FARMACEUTICOS ROVI, S.A. c/Julián Camarillo, 35 28037 Madrid / ES | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guierro Aduriz, Ibon c/ Julián Camarillo, 35 28037 Madrid / ES | 02 /
Gómez Ochoa, María Teresa c/ Julián Camarillo, 35 28037 Madrid / ES | [2021/41] |
Former [2011/50] | 01 /
Guierro Aduriz, Ibon c/ Julián Camarillo, 35 28037, Madrid / ES | ||
02 /
Gomez Ochoa, María Teresa c/ Julián Camarillo, 35 28037, Madrid / ES | Representative(s) | Elzaburu S.L.P. Edificio Torre de Cristal Paseo de la Castellana 259 C, planta 28 28046 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/41] | Elzaburu S.L.P. Miguel Angel 21, 2nd floor 28010 Madrid / ES | ||
Former [2011/50] | Elzaburu Marquez, Alberto, et al ELZABURU S.L.P. C/ Miguel Angel, 21, 2º 28010 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10382153.4 | 31.05.2010 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394663 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2394663 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/34 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
A61K9/0024 (EP,US);
A61K9/0002 (US);
A61K31/4196 (EP,US);
A61K31/4468 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/41] |
Former [2011/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen für injizierbare, in-situ biologisch abbaubare Implantate | [2011/50] | English: | Compositions for injectable in-situ biodegradable implants | [2011/50] | French: | Compositions pour implants biodégradables in situ injectables | [2011/50] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/31] | 23.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 27.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.09.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 27.09.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 27.09.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.10.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9936071 (KOREA RES INST CHEM TECH [KR], et al) [X] 1-4,8-10 * page 5, line 22 - line 27 * * page 6, line 10 - page 8, line 11 * * page 9, line 14 - line 18 * * page 10, line 28 - page 11, line 17 * * page 12; example 1 * * page 14; example 8 * * claim - * [I] 1-18; | [XI]US2004247870 (BROWN JOSIAH [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10 * page 1, paragraph 7 - page 2, paragraph 15 * * page 4, paragraph 56 - page 5, paragraph 57 * * page 6, paragraph 72 - paragraph 73 * * page 8, paragraph 88 * * paragraph [0113] - paragraph [0122]; example 1 * * claim - * [I] 1-18; | [XDI]WO2008153611 (QLT USA INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-5,7-10 * page 2, line 30 - page 8, line 22 * * page 17, line 28 - line 34 * * page 19, line 29 - page 20, line 2 * * page 48 * * pages 65-67 * * pages 103,104 * * page 221, line 3 - page 224, line 17 * * claim - * [I] 1-18; | [XI]WO2009060473 (PANACEA BIOTEC LTD [IN], et al) [X] 1-5,7-18 * page 7, line 8 - page 9, line 19 * * page 44; example 11 * * claim - *[I] 1-18 | by applicant | US3636956 | US3773919 | US4389330 | US4523591 | US4530840 | US4938763 | US5620700 | US5688801 | US5770231 | WO0024374 | WO0135929 | US6331311 | WO0238185 | US6673767 | WO2004081196 | US6803055 | US7118763 | WO2008100576 | WO2008153611 | - "IUPAC. Basic definitions of terms relating to polymers 1974", PURE APPL. CHEM., (1974), vol. 40, pages 477 - 491 |