EP2418491 - Method for the diagnosis of dry eye and blepharitis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2013 [2013/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bioftalmik, S.L. Parque Technológico de Vizcaya Edificio 800, 2º Planta 48160 Derio (Vizcaya) / ES | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soria Esponera, Javier BIOFTALMIK S.L. Parque Tecnológico de Vizcaya Edificio 800, 2a Planta 48160 Derio (Bizkaia) / ES | 02 /
Suarez Cortés, Tatiana BIOFTALMIK S.L. Parque Tecnológico de Vizcaya Edificio 800, 2a Planta 48160 Derio (Bizkaia) / ES | 03 /
Gonzalez Fernandez, Nerea BIOFTALMIK S.L. Parque Tecnológico de Vizcaya Edificio 800, 2a Planta 48160 Derio (Bizkaia) / ES | 04 /
Acera Osa, Arantxa BIOFTALMIK S.L. Parque Tecnológico de Vizcaya Edificio 800, 2a Planta 48160 Derio (Bizkaia) / ES | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 10382229.2 | 10.08.2010 | [2012/07] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2418491 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP,US);
G01N2800/101 (EP,US);
G01N2800/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Diagnose von Xerophthalmie und Blepharitis | [2012/07] | English: | Method for the diagnosis of dry eye and blepharitis | [2012/07] | French: | Procédé pour le diagnostic de la sécheresse oculaire et de la blépharite | [2012/07] | Examination procedure | 17.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/06] | 21.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR20060077374 (UNIV KOREA IND & ACAD COOP [KR]) [A] 3,4,9-12 * the whole document * * See in particular: Title and abstract; Examples 1-4. Fig. 1. * * This document is relevant for originally identified invention 10. *; | [A]US2009258828 (BEUERMAN ROGER [SG], et al) [A] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Fig. 1-8; paragraphs 1, 2, 16, 77-100 (examples 1-10). * * This document is relevant for originally identified Invention 1. *; | [X] - NICHOLS JASON J ET AL, "Mass spectrometry-based proteomic analyses in contact lens-related dry eye.", CORNEA DEC 2009 LNKD- PUBMED:19770725, (200912), vol. 28, no. 10, ISSN 1536-4798, pages 1109 - 1117, XP008129932 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Methods section; Discussion, 3rd paragraph; Table 1. * * This document is relevant for originally identified Invention 1. * | [X] - VERSURA P ET AL, "Proteomic analysis in hyperevaporative dry eye patients", RIVISTA ITALIANA DELLA MEDICINA DI LABORATORIO 2009 SIMEL SOCIETA ITALIANA DI MEDICINA DI LABORATORIO ITA, (2009), vol. 5, no. 4, ISSN 1825-859X, pages 290 - 297, XP002612107 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract (Riassunto); Materiali e metodi section; Figura 2-3. * * This document is relevant for originally identified Invention 1. * | [X] - VERSURA P ET AL, "Tear proteomics in evaporative dry eye disease.", EYE (LONDON, ENGLAND) AUG 2010 LNKD- PUBMED:20150925, (20100212), vol. 24, no. 8, ISSN 1476-5454, pages 1396 - 1402, XP008129926 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section; Table 3; Figure 1. * * This document is relevant for originally identified Invention 1. * | [X] - KOO BON-SUK ET AL, "Comparative analysis of the tear protein expression in blepharitis patients using two-dimensional electrophoresis", JOURNAL OF PROTEOME RESEARCH, (200505), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1535-3893, pages 719 - 724, XP002631281 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section; Table 1. * * This document is relevant for originally identified Invention 3 (Cystatin S, aka cystain SAIII) as well as for invention 10. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/PR0498133 | [X] - BALDINI ET AL, "Proteomic analysis of the saliva: A clue for understanding primary from secondary Sjogren's syndrome?", AUTOIMMUNITY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20080109), vol. 7, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.AUTREV.2007.11.002, ISSN 1568-9972, pages 185 - 191, XP022413397 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; p. 188, col. 1-2, bridging paragraph; p. 189, table 2. * * This document is relevant for inventions 3 (cystain S) for originally identified invention 4 (cystatin N, aka cystatin SN). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.autrev.2007.11.002 | [X] - FERRACCIOLI G ET AL, "Proteomic approaches to Sjogren's syndrome: A clue to interpret the pathophysiology and organ involvement of the disease", AUTOIMMUNITY REVIEWS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 9, no. 9, ISSN 1568-9972, (20100701), pages 622 - 626, (20100701), XP027130642 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Table 1. * * This document is relevant for originally identified invention 4 (cystatin N, aka cystatin SN). * | [X] - GIUSTI LAURA ET AL, "Proteome analysis of whole saliva: a new tool for rheumatic diseases--the example of Sjögren's syndrome.", PROTEOMICS MAY 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:17436266, (200705), vol. 7, no. 10, ISSN 1615-9853, pages 1634 - 1643, XP002631282 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; abstract; Material and methods section; Tables 2-4; Discussion, paragraphs 1 and 3. * * This document is relevant for originally identified inventions 3 and 4. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/PMIC.200600783 | [X] - STEINFELD SERGE ET AL, "Big prolactin 60 kDa is overexpressed in salivary glandular epithelial cells from patients with Sjogren's syndrome", LABORATORY INVESTIGATION, (200002), vol. 80, no. 2, ISSN 0023-6837, pages 239 - 247, XP002631283 [X] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Summary; p. 240, col. 1, 1st paragraph; Fig. 1; * * This document is relevant for originally identified invention 6 (S100A6). * | [X] - YUAN YUNFENG ET AL, "Reduction of GSTP1 expression by DNA methylation correlates with clinicopathological features in pituitary adenomas", MODERN PATHOLOGY, (200807), vol. 21, no. 7, ISSN 0893-3952, pages 856 - 865, XP002631284 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section. * * This document is relevant for originally identified invention 7 (GSTP1). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/MODPATHOL.2008.60 | [A] - MENEGAY MICHELLE ET AL, "Proteomic analysis of climatic keratopathy droplets.", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE JUL 2008 LNKD- PUBMED:18378572, (200807), vol. 49, no. 7, ISSN 1552-5783, pages 2829 - 2837, XP002631285 [A] 1,2,9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Table 1. * * This document is relevant for originally identified invention 8 (Annexin I). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1167/IOVS.07-1438 | [X] - PICKLES KIRSTIE J ET AL, "Expression of annexin-1 in equine leucocytes and the effects of the N-terminal annexin-1 peptide, Ac2-26, on equine neutrophil superoxide production", VETERINARY IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOPATHOLOGY, (201006), vol. 135, no. 3-4, ISSN 0165-2427, pages 226 - 233, XP002631286 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section. * * This document is relevant for originally identified invention 8 (annexin I). * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.VETIMM.2009.12.002 | [X] - MECHTHILD STOECKELHUBER ET AL, "Immunohistochemical analysis of secretoglobin SCGB 2A1 expression in human ocular glands and tissues", HISTOCHEMISTRY AND CELL BIOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20060104), vol. 126, no. 1, doi:10.1007/S00418-005-0137-2, ISSN 1432-119X, pages 103 - 109, XP019427003 [X] 9-12 * the whole document * * In particular: Title; Abstract; Materials and methods section. * * This document is relevant for originally identified invention 10. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00418-005-0137-2 | by applicant | US4774339 | US5268486 | - THE OCULAR SURFACE, (200704), vol. 5, no. 2, pages 69 - 202 | - LEMP MA, "Report of the National Eye Institute/Industry workshop on Clinical Trials in Dry Eyes", CLAO J., (1995), vol. 21, pages 221 - 32 | - ALTSCHUL, S. ET AL., BLASTManual, NCBI NLM NIH | - ALTSCHUL, S. ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1990), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - MUJUMDAR, R. B. ET AL., CYTOMETRY, (1989), vol. 10, pages 11 - 19 |