EP2384996 - Capsule for coffee, method for its production and device for brewing coffee [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.10.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.11.2012 [2012/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luna Technology Systems LTS GmbH C/o Interrevision ag Schuppisstrasse 6 9016 St. Gallen / CH | [2011/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deuber, Louis Säntisstrasse 17 8805 Richterswil / CH | [2011/45] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2011/45] | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10405093.5 | 04.05.2010 | [2011/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2384996 | Date: | 09.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/804, A47J31/06 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B65D85/8055 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B65D85/804 (CN,KR);
A47J31/00 (CN);
A47J31/407 (US);
A47J31/06 (CN,KR);
A47J31/0689 (EP,RU,US);
A47J31/18 (CN);
A47J31/34 (KR);
A47J31/3623 (RU,US);
A47J31/44 (CN);
B65D43/02 (US);
A47J31/369 (RU,US);
B65B29/022 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kapsel für ein Extraktionsgut, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung, und Einrichtung zum Brühen von Kaffee | [2011/45] | English: | Capsule for coffee, method for its production and device for brewing coffee | [2011/45] | French: | Capsule à café, procédé de fabrication et dispositif pour préparer un café | [2011/45] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/45] | 19.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/45] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO2008011913 (ILLYCAFFE SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1-6,9 * page 5, line 1 - line 18; figures 1-3 *[A] 11-14 | by applicant | EP1344722 | US2005051478 | EP1886942 | WO2010CH00098 | WO2010CH00097 | WO2010CH00099 |