EP2402518 - Automatic cleaning device for toilets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Geberit International AG Schachenstrasse 77 8645 Jona / CH | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Urs Inglin Langackerstrasse 6 8853 Lachen / CH | 02 /
Mario Von Balmoos Erlenstrasse 109 8645 Jone / CH | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | Frischknecht, Harry Ralph, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2012/01] | Groner, Manfred Isler & Pedrazzini AG Gotthardstrasse 53 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10405125.5 | 30.06.2010 | [2012/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2402518 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E03D9/00 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
E03D9/002 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Automatische Reinigungsvorrichtung für Toiletten | [2012/01] | English: | Automatic cleaning device for toilets | [2012/01] | French: | Dispositif de nettoyage automatique pour toilettes | [2012/01] | Examination procedure | 07.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/27] | 27.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/23] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2009044322 (NUNEZ BOLIVAR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7,13-15 * the whole document * [A] 11,12 [I] 4; | [A]DE29617815U (PERIC MILOS [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE29621394U (HITZLER ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE29810772U | DE29803216U |