EP2431588 - Turbocharger unit with associated auxiliary component for an internal combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fiat Powertrain Technologies S.p.A. Corso Settembrini 167 10135 Torino / IT | [2012/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferrazzi, Francesco c/o Fiat Group Automobiles S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [2012/12] | Representative(s) | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx S.p.A. Corso Vittorio Emanuele ll, 6 10123 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Notaro, Giancarlo Buzzi, Notaro & Antonielli d'Oulx Via Maria Vittoria 18 10123 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 10425307.5 | 20.09.2010 | [2012/12] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2431588 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2431588 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F02B37/00, F02C6/12, F04D25/04, F02B67/10, F01D25/28, F01D25/24, F01D25/04 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
F01D25/28 (EP,US);
F02B37/00 (EP,US);
F02B67/10 (EP,US);
F02C6/12 (EP,US);
F02C7/20 (EP,US);
F04D25/024 (EP,US);
F04D29/083 (EP,US);
F04D29/4206 (EP,US);
F04D29/601 (EP,US);
F05D2220/40 (EP,US);
F05D2240/55 (EP,US);
F05D2240/90 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/12] | Title | German: | Turboladereinheit mit zughöriger Hilfskomponente für einen Verbrennungsmotor | [2012/12] | English: | Turbocharger unit with associated auxiliary component for an internal combustion engine | [2012/12] | French: | Unité de turbocompresseur avec composant auxiliaire pour un moteur à combustion interne | [2012/12] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2011 | Examination requested [2012/12] | 03.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2010 | AL | 19.09.2012 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | HR | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MK | 19.09.2012 | MT | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | SM | 19.09.2012 | IE | 20.09.2012 | LU | 20.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | NO | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/32] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 20.09.2010 | |
AL | 19.09.2012 | ||
AT | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 20.09.2012 | ||
LU | 20.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AL | 19.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
SM | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 20.09.2012 | ||
LU | 20.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AL | 19.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 20.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AL | 19.09.2012 | |
AT | 19.09.2012 | ||
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 20.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 20.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
IE | 20.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
HR | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
NO | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | |
NO | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2005133012 (GRUSSMANN ELMAR [DE], et al) [I] 1 * abstract * * pages 21,22,26 * * figure 3 *; | [A]EP1801362 (IVECO SPA [IT]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0013] , [0014] , [0018] ** figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2010098533 (GRUSSMANN ELMAR [DE], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0027] , [0034] * * figures 1,4 * |