EP2454931 - Easy system for grapes harvest and vineyard works [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vacchelli, Giovanni Porto Turisico 6/7 58100 Marina di Grosseto / IT | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/21] | Application number, filing date | 10425354.7 | 17.11.2010 | [2012/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2454931 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01D45/00, A01D46/00, A01D46/28, A01D91/04, B62D33/02, B62D63/06 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
A01D45/001 (EP);
A01D46/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Einfaches System für Weinlese- und Weinbauarbeiten | [2012/21] | English: | Easy system for grapes harvest and vineyard works | [2012/21] | French: | Système facile pour vendanges et travaux de viticulture | [2012/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/21] | 09.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2701022 (CHESTNUTT JOHN E) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 3 - line 67; figures 1-3 *; | [X]FR2330302 (LOFFICIAL RENE [FR]) [X] 1-3 * page 3, line 15 - line 34; figure - *; | [X]DE3101746 (SCHNEIDER FRITZ) [X] 1-3 * page 5, line 9 - page 6, line 1; figure - *; | [X]US2006123755 (SCHUSTER JOSEPH A [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0037]; figure 18 *; | [X]DE102007011550 (KAEMPCHEN KATHRIN [DE]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029]; figures 1-4 *; | [X]WO2009147672 (NETAFIM LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-3* page 6, paragraph 5 - page 7, paragraph 4; figure 2 * |