EP2210977 - Device for the treatment, in particular for low pressure treatment, of the wire or felt of a papermachine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bartelmuss, Klaus Nr. 63 8833 Teufenbach / AT | For all designated states Bartelmuss, Heinz Nr. 63 8833 Teufenbach / AT | [2010/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/30] | Representative(s) | Beer, Manfred, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/30] | Beer, Manfred, et al BEER & PARTNER PATENTANWÄLTE KG Lindengasse 8 1070 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 10450007.9 | 11.09.2003 | [2010/30] | Priority number, date | AT20030000257 | 20.02.2003 Original published format: AT 2572003 | [2010/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2210977 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2210977 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D21F1/48, D21F1/52, D21F1/18, D21F1/20 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
D21F1/20 (EP,US);
D21F1/18 (EP,US);
D21F1/52 (EP,US);
D21F1/523 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/30] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung, insbesondere zur Unterdruck-Beaufschlagung, des in einer Anlage zur Papiererzeugung vorgesehenen, im Umlauf bewegten mindestens einen Siebbandes bzw. Filzbandes | [2010/30] | English: | Device for the treatment, in particular for low pressure treatment, of the wire or felt of a papermachine | [2010/30] | French: | Dispositif pour traiter en particulier pour traiter par depression, la toile de fabrication où le feutre d'une machine à papier | [2010/30] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Examination requested [2010/42] | 08.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 24.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03450202.1 / EP1449958 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030450202) is 08.03.2005 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.06.2011 | CZ | 01.06.2011 | DK | 01.06.2011 | EE | 01.06.2011 | HU | 01.06.2011 | IE | 01.06.2011 | NL | 01.06.2011 | RO | 01.06.2011 | SI | 01.06.2011 | SK | 01.06.2011 | TR | 01.06.2011 | BG | 01.09.2011 | GR | 02.09.2011 | LU | 11.09.2011 | BE | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | PT | 03.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
TR | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
LU | 11.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
LU | 11.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
LU | 11.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/30] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
BE | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/14] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
CZ | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
PT | 03.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
NL | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1761174 (LEDER & RIEMEN PATENT) [Y] 1-7 * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 15, paragraph 4; figures 1-17 *; | [Y]DE2534998 (JWI LTD) [Y] 1-7,10-12* page 11, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 4; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]AT389534B (ALBERT HANS [AT]) [Y] 1-4,6,7,10-12 * page 3, line 33 - page 4, line 44; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE2534998 |