EP2385762 - PESTICIDAL MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GEWEHR, Markus Goethestrasse 21 56288 Kastellaun / DE | 02 /
GLADWIN, Robert, John 6 Cheltenham Close Macclesfield SK10 2WD / GB | 03 /
BRAHM, Lutz Am Hang 16 67551 Worms / DE | 04 /
HADEN, Egon Maulbronner Hof 24 67346 Speyer / DE | 05 /
TAVARES-RODRIGUES, Marco-Antonio Lino de Almeida Pires 282 apto 51 04317-180 Jabaquara - Sao Paulo - Sao Paulo / BR | 06 /
PEOPLES, Scott 5732 Dutch Creek Drive Raleigh North Carolina 27606 / US | 07 /
HUPE, Elke 1446 Lamberts Mill Rd Scotch Plains, 070776 New Jersey / US | [2011/46] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/46] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10700008.5 | 06.01.2010 | WO2010EP50068 | Priority number, date | US20090143049P | 07.01.2009 Original published format: US 143049 P | US20090220217P | 25.06.2009 Original published format: US 220217 P | [2011/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010079176 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2385762 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/50, A01N37/50, A01N43/16, A01N43/24, A01N43/40, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/88, A01N47/24, A01P3/00, A01P13/00 | [2011/46] | CPC: |
A01N43/50 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A01N37/50 (BR,KR);
A01N43/16 (BR,KR);
A01N43/24 (BR);
A01N43/40 (BR);
A01N43/54 (BR);
A01N43/56 (BR);
A01N43/88 (BR);
A01N47/24 (BR);
A01N2300/00 (BR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N43/50, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/50, A01N37/50, A01N43/16, A01N43/24, A01N43/40, A01N43/50, A01N43/54, A01N43/56, A01N43/88, A01N47/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | PESTIZIDE MISCHUNGEN | [2011/46] | English: | PESTICIDAL MIXTURES | [2011/46] | French: | MÉLANGES PESTICIDES | [2011/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 11.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 01.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2006066810 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [ID] 1-19* the whole document * |