EP2382033 - DIVERSION STATION COMPRISING A MIXING DEVICE FOR MIXING WATER AND WATER VAPOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/44] | MIXING DEVICE FOR MIXING WATER AND WATER VAPOR IN A DIVERSION STATION | ||
[2013/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRASSMANN, Arne Stauseebogen 79 45259 Essen / DE | 02 /
MUSCH, Christian Zölestinstr. 16 45259 Essen / DE | 03 /
STÜER, Heinrich Antruper Str. 24 45721 Haltern / DE | [2011/44] | Application number, filing date | 10700226.3 | 08.01.2010 | WO2010EP50122 | Priority number, date | EP20090001085 | 27.01.2009 Original published format: EP 09001085 | [2011/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010086199 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382033 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382033 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01F3/04, B01F5/04, B01F5/06 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
B01F23/2132 (EP,US);
B01F25/3131 (EP,US);
B01F25/45 (EP,US);
B01F25/45231 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UMLEITSTATION UMFASSEND EINE MISCHEINRICHTUNG ZUR VERMISCHUNG VON WASSER UND WASSERDAMPF | [2013/28] | English: | DIVERSION STATION COMPRISING A MIXING DEVICE FOR MIXING WATER AND WATER VAPOR | [2013/28] | French: | STATION DE DÉRIVATION AVEC UN DISPOSITIF MÉLANGEUR POUR MÉLANGER DE L'EAU ET DE LA VAPEUR D'EAU | [2013/28] |
Former [2011/44] | MISCHEINRICHTUNG ZUR VERMISCHUNG VON WASSER UND WASSERDAMPF IN EINER UMLEITSTATION | ||
Former [2011/44] | MIXING DEVICE FOR MIXING WATER AND WATER VAPOR IN A DIVERSION STATION | ||
Former [2011/44] | DISPOSITIF MÉLANGEUR POUR MÉLANGER DE L'EAU ET DE LA VAPEUR D'EAU DANS UNE STATION DE DÉRIVATION | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 10.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.01.2010 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MK | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | SM | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | IE | 08.01.2014 | LU | 08.01.2014 | BE | 31.01.2014 | NO | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 08.01.2010 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
TR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.01.2010 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 08.01.2014 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 08.01.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [IA]EP0596155 (FUKAI TOSHIHARU [JP]) [I] 1 * figures 1,2 * * abstract * * column 7, line 11 - line 14 * [A] 2-7; | [IA]US3094171 (GAGLIARDO JOHN P) [I] 1,3,5 * figures 1-5 * * column 3, line 34 - line 50 * * column 4, line 4 - line 51 * [A] 2,4,6,7; | [IA]DE10254569 (BAYOSAN WACHTER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [I] 1-3,6 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0012] * [A] 4,5,7; | [IA]US4830790 (STEVENSON DOUGLAS E [CA]) [I] 1,3,4 * figure 4 * * column 4, line 28 - line 39 * [A] 2,5-7; | [IA]US2005035153 (BROWN DANIEL P [US]) [I] 1,6,7 * figures 4-7 * * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0035] - [0038] * [A] 2-5; | [IA]DE19851360 (SPIEGEL MARGRET [DE]) [I] 1,5 * figures 1,4 * * column 2, line 45 - line 52 * * column 4, line 10 - line 36 * [A] 2-4,6,7; | [A]EP0467147 (SCHWAEBISCHE HUETTENWERKE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]DE4122014 (MERCEDES-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT, 7000 STUTTGART, DE) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 63 - line 68 * | Examination | DE960354 | GB315629 | US1773053 | by applicant | EP0596155 |