EP2377072 - METHOD AND PORTABLE DEVICE FOR RECOGNISING BARCODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETH Zurich Raemistrasse 101/ETH Transfer 8092 Zurich / CH | [2011/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADELMANN, Robert Ekkehardstrasse 32 CH-8006 Zürich / CH | [2011/42] | Representative(s) | Frei Patent Attorneys Frei Patentanwaltsbüro AG Hagenholzstrasse 85 8050 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2015/49] | Müller, Markus Andreas Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | ||
Former [2011/42] | Müller, Markus Andreas Frei Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 1771 8032 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 10700373.3 | 11.01.2010 | [2015/49] | WO2010EP00081 | Priority number, date | EP20090000470 | 15.01.2009 Original published format: EP 09000470 | [2011/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010081664 | Date: | 22.07.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2377072 | Date: | 19.10.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2377072 | Date: | 02.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06K7/14, G06N3/02, G06T1/00, G06T5/00 | [2015/26] | CPC: |
G06K7/14 (EP,US);
G06K7/1491 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/42] | G06K7/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND TRAGBARES GERÄT ZUM ERKENNEN VON BARCODES | [2011/42] | English: | METHOD AND PORTABLE DEVICE FOR RECOGNISING BARCODES | [2011/42] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PORTATIF POUR LA DÉTECTION DE CODES À BARRES | [2011/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/42] | 27.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 15.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 02.12.2015 | CY | 02.12.2015 | CZ | 02.12.2015 | EE | 02.12.2015 | HR | 02.12.2015 | LT | 02.12.2015 | LV | 02.12.2015 | MC | 02.12.2015 | MK | 02.12.2015 | MT | 02.12.2015 | RO | 02.12.2015 | SI | 02.12.2015 | SK | 02.12.2015 | SM | 02.12.2015 | LU | 11.01.2016 | GR | 03.03.2016 | IS | 02.04.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/28] | CY | 02.12.2015 | |
CZ | 02.12.2015 | ||
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MK | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
MT | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SI | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
MC | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2016 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
SM | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
IS | 02.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
EE | 02.12.2015 | ||
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
RO | 02.12.2015 | ||
SK | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 02.12.2015 | |
HR | 02.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | HR | 02.12.2015 | |
IS | 02.12.2015 | ||
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | HR | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
LV | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | HR | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 02.12.2015 | |
LT | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 02.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5401949 (ZIEMACKI MICHAEL S [US], et al) [A] 1-14* abstract *; | [A]US5682030 (KUBON DANIEL GEORGE [US]) [A] 1-14 * column 20, line 42 - line 48 *; | [A]US2007119943 (MADEJ DARIUSZ [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] * | by applicant | - J. KIM; H. LEE, "Joint nonuniform illumination estimation and deblurring for bar code signals", OPT. EXPRESS, (2007), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1364/OE.15.014817, pages 14817 - 14837, XP002494851 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1364/OE.15.014817 | - TA-HSIN LI; KE-SHIN LII, "Deblurring Two-Tone Images by A Joint Estimation Approach Using Higher-Order Statistics", SPW-HOS '97, (1997), doi:doi:10.1109/HOST.1997.613497, page 108, XP010239826 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/HOST.1997.613497 | - S. ESEDOGLU, "Blind deconvolution of bar code signals", INVERSE PROBL., (2004), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1088/0266-5611/20/1/007, pages 121 - 135, XP020030623 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1088/0266-5611/20/1/007 |