EP2374193 - COMMUNICATION ACROSS AN INDUCTIVE LINK WITH A DYNAMIC LOAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Access Business Group International LLC 7575 Fulton Street East Ada, Michigan 49355 / US | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAARMAN, David W. 6414 127th Avenue Fennville Michigan 49408 / US | 02 /
SCHWANNECKE, Joshua K. 4253 Arlet Court, SE Grand Rapids Michigan 49546 / US | 03 /
MOLLEMA, Scott A. 5905 Fieldstone Ridge Rockford Michigan 49341 / US | 04 /
NORCONK, Matthew J. 2075 Sandpiper Pt., NE Apt. 320 Grand Rapids, Michigan 49505 / US | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2011/41] | Merrifield, Sarah Elizabeth Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10700609.0 | 05.01.2010 | WO2010US20062 | Priority number, date | US20090142842P | 06.01.2009 Original published format: US 142842 P | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010080737 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2374193 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H02J5/00, H02J17/00, G06K7/00 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H02J50/80 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/10 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/0707 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/0712 (EP,KR,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,KR,US);
H02J50/90 (KR);
H04B5/26 (EP,KR,US);
H04B5/72 (KR,US);
H04B5/79 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATION IN EINER INDUKTIVEN VERBINDUNG MIT DYNAMISCHER LAST | [2011/41] | English: | COMMUNICATION ACROSS AN INDUCTIVE LINK WITH A DYNAMIC LOAD | [2011/41] | French: | COMMUNICATION SUR UNE LIGNE INDUCTIVE AVEC UNE CHARGE DYNAMIQUE | [2011/41] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 24.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 30.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP0267009 (MARS INC [US]); | [XI]EP0878891 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [XI]US2009001929 (POSAMENTIER JOSHUA [US]) | by applicant | US6825620 | US7212414 | US20030689148 | US20070855710 | US20070965085 | US20080019411 |