EP2382041 - VANADIUM-FREE DIESEL OXIDATION CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt/Main / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | For all designated states Süd-Chemie AG Lenbachplatz 6 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTELE, Andreas Schusterstrasse 12 a 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 02 /
WANNINGER, Klaus Am Eglsee 2 83059 Kolbermoor / DE | 03 /
MALETZ, Gerd Hochfellnstrasse 6 83043 Bad Aibling / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Martin Panoramastrasse 34/I 76327 Pfinztal / DE | [2011/44] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Stolmár & Partner Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/44] | Stolmár Scheele & Partner Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10701630.5 | 27.01.2010 | WO2010EP00486 | Priority number, date | DE20091006403 | 28.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009006403 | [2011/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010086148 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2382041 | Date: | 02.11.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2382041 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01J23/42, B01J37/02, B01J37/08, B01D53/94 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
B01J23/42 (EP,US);
B01D53/944 (EP,US);
B01J23/63 (EP,US);
B01J37/0203 (EP,US);
B01J37/0228 (EP,US);
B01J37/0248 (EP,US);
B01J37/08 (EP,US);
B01J37/16 (EP,US);
F01N13/12 (EP,US);
B01D2255/1021 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20707 (EP,US);
B01D2255/20715 (EP,US);
B01D2255/2092 (EP,US);
B01D2255/30 (EP,US);
B01D2255/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VANADIUMFREIER DIESEL-OXIDATIONSKATALYSATOR UND VEFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2011/44] | English: | VANADIUM-FREE DIESEL OXIDATION CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2011/44] | French: | CATALYSEUR D'OXYDATION DIESEL EXEMPT DE VANADIUM, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2011/44] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/44] | 10.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.12.2013 | 10.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2012 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.01.2010 | CY | 23.07.2014 | CZ | 23.07.2014 | DK | 23.07.2014 | EE | 23.07.2014 | ES | 23.07.2014 | FI | 23.07.2014 | HR | 23.07.2014 | IT | 23.07.2014 | LT | 23.07.2014 | LV | 23.07.2014 | MC | 23.07.2014 | MK | 23.07.2014 | MT | 23.07.2014 | NL | 23.07.2014 | PL | 23.07.2014 | RO | 23.07.2014 | SE | 23.07.2014 | SI | 23.07.2014 | SK | 23.07.2014 | SM | 23.07.2014 | TR | 23.07.2014 | BG | 23.10.2014 | NO | 23.10.2014 | GR | 24.10.2014 | IS | 23.11.2014 | PT | 24.11.2014 | AT | 27.01.2015 | GB | 27.01.2015 | IE | 27.01.2015 | LU | 27.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 27.01.2010 | |
CY | 23.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
SM | 23.07.2014 | ||
TR | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
AT | 27.01.2015 | ||
GB | 27.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
MT | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
AT | 27.01.2015 | ||
GB | 27.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
AT | 27.01.2015 | ||
GB | 27.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 27.01.2015 | ||
IE | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SI | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
GB | 27.01.2015 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
MC | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
LU | 27.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
CZ | 23.07.2014 | ||
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
EE | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
SK | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
DK | 23.07.2014 | ||
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
IT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
RO | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
HR | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
LV | 23.07.2014 | ||
NL | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
IS | 23.11.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 23.07.2014 | |
ES | 23.07.2014 | ||
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
PL | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
GR | 24.10.2014 | ||
PT | 24.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 23.07.2014 | |
FI | 23.07.2014 | ||
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
BG | 23.10.2014 | ||
NO | 23.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 23.07.2014 | |
LT | 23.07.2014 | ||
SE | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 23.07.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]EP1040870 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1,3-6,10-15 * paragraphs [0024] , [0025] , [0049] , [0050] , [0060] , [0061]; claims 1-8, 23 * * paragraphs [0084] - [0090]; examples 1-4; table 1 * * paragraphs [0144] - [0146]; figures 7,8; examples 27,28; table 3 * * paragraphs [0176] , [ 178] - [0181]; figure 11; examples 32-37 * [Y] 2,16-19 [I] 7-9; | [XYI]EP1287876 (TOYODA CHUO KENKYUSHO KK [JP]) [X] 1,5,6,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0042] , [0043]; examples 1-3; claim 6 * [Y] 2,7-9,13,16-19 [I] 3,4; | [XYI]WO9933549 (ENGELHARD CORP [US]) [X] 1,5-15 * page 16, lines 6-14 * * page 16, line 35 - page 17, line 35 * * page 18, line 27 - page 19, line 30 * * page 20, lines 11-20 * * example 4; claim 1 * [Y] 2,16-19 [I] 3,4; | [XAY]DE102007023979 (UMICORE AG & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6,10,12-15 * paragraphs [0007] , [0030] , [0034] , [0052]; example 1; claims 1, 5, 10, 12, 16 * [A] 11 [Y] 2,7-9,16-19; | [XAY]EP1121979 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-15 * page 6, lines 10-20; examples 1-6; claim 9; table I * [A] 4 [Y] 2,7-9,16-19; | [Y]US2003140620 (SHIGAPOV ALBERT NAZIPOVICH [DE], et al) [Y] 16-19 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0031] * * figure 2 *; | [Y]EP1820561 (MAZDA MOTOR [JP]) [Y] 16-19 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2008124264 (IKEDA MASANORI [JP], et al) [Y] 7-9,13,16-18 * paragraph [0066]; example 6; claims 5-8 *; | [Y]US2004082461 (REMANS THOMAS JORIS [NL], et al) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0030]; example 1 * | by applicant | DE102007023979 | US2008124264 | US5157007 | EP0706817 | EP0800856 | EP1040870 | EP1287876 | WO9933549 | EP1129764 |