EP2391482 - GRINDING WHEEL COMPRISING VEGETABLE SEEDS AS FILLING MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/49] | GRINDING DISK HAVING PLANT SEED CAPSULES AS A FILLER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
[2013/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rhodius Schleifwerkzeuge GmbH & Co. KG Brohltalstrasse 2 56659 Burgbrohl / DE | [2011/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KEULER, Josef Vinxtweg 4 53474 Bad Neuenahr-Ahrweiler / DE | 02 /
STANG, Christian Karl-Friedrich-Schinkel-Strasse 29 53127 Bonn / DE | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | Gritschneder, Martin, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Gritschneder, Martin, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/49] | Gritschneder, Martin Abitz & Partner - Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10701675.0 | 28.01.2010 | WO2010EP50996 | Priority number, date | DE20091006699 | 29.01.2009 Original published format: DE102009006699 | [2011/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010086371 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391482 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2391482 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B24D3/20, B24D3/32, B24D3/34 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
B24D3/342 (EP,US);
B24D3/20 (EP,US);
B24D3/32 (EP,US);
B24D3/348 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLEIFSCHEIBE MIT PFLANZLICHEN SAMENKAPSELN ALS FÜLLSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2013/19] | English: | GRINDING WHEEL COMPRISING VEGETABLE SEEDS AS FILLING MATERIAL AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2013/19] | French: | MEULE COMPRENANT DES CONCEPATACLES VEGETALS COMME MATERIEL DE REMPLISSAGE ET PROCEDE DE SA FABRICATION | [2013/19] |
Former [2011/49] | SCHLEIFSCHEIBE MIT PFLANZLICHEN SAMENKAPSELN ALS FÜLLSTOFF UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2011/49] | GRINDING DISK HAVING PLANT SEED CAPSULES AS A FILLER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | ||
Former [2011/49] | DISQUE ABRASIF PRÉSENTANT COMME CHARGE DES CAPSULES DE SEMENCES VÉGÉTALES ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION CORRESPONDANT | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2010 | BG | 04.09.2013 | CY | 04.09.2013 | CZ | 04.09.2013 | DK | 04.09.2013 | EE | 04.09.2013 | FI | 04.09.2013 | HR | 04.09.2013 | LT | 04.09.2013 | LV | 04.09.2013 | MC | 04.09.2013 | MK | 04.09.2013 | MT | 04.09.2013 | RO | 04.09.2013 | SE | 04.09.2013 | SI | 04.09.2013 | SK | 04.09.2013 | SM | 04.09.2013 | TR | 04.09.2013 | NO | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.12.2013 | IS | 04.01.2014 | PT | 06.01.2014 | GB | 28.01.2014 | IE | 28.01.2014 | LU | 28.01.2014 | BE | 31.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
TR | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
BG | 04.09.2013 | ||
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.09.2013 | |
CY | 04.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
SM | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
MT | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
MC | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
IE | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
GB | 28.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
DK | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
LU | 28.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
PT | 06.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
CZ | 04.09.2013 | ||
EE | 04.09.2013 | ||
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
SK | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
RO | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 04.09.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
FI | 04.09.2013 | ||
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
LV | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
SI | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 31.07.2013 | |
HR | 04.09.2013 | ||
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 04.09.2013 | |
LT | 04.09.2013 | ||
SE | 04.09.2013 | ||
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 04.09.2013 | |
NO | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 04.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE102004035088 (CHEMETALL GES MBH WIEN [AT]) [AD] 1-14 * paragraphs [0020] , [0022] , [0039] *; | [A]US2537541 (MILLIGAN LOWELL H, et al) [A] 1-14 * column 8, line 23 - column 9, line 16; figures 5-8 *; | [AD]US5203886 (SHELDON DAVID A [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 5, lines 1-32 * | by applicant | US5221294 | US5203886 | DE60206661T | DE12943 | DE102004035088 | DE69705538T | DE10297124T |