EP2396160 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PLURALITY OF SHAPED FOAM ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.05.2013 [2013/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC (formerly Known As Dow Global Technologies Inc.) 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAURER, Myron 2414 Maple Road Saginaw, MI 48601 / US | 02 /
MITTAG, Matthew 3811 E. Patrick Road Midland, MI 48642 / US | 03 /
FITING, Casey 3178 N. Thomas Road Freeland, MI 48623 / US | 04 /
SAGNARD, Alain 6 rue des Vergers F-67410 Drusenheim / FR | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10701795.6 | 29.01.2010 | WO2010US22464 | Priority number, date | US20090152415P | 13.02.2009 Original published format: US 152415 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010093524 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2396160 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/56 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
B29C44/5627 (EP,US);
B29C44/352 (EP,US);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG MEHRERER GEFORMTER SCHAUMARTIKEL | [2011/51] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A PLURALITY OF SHAPED FOAM ARTICLES | [2011/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE PLURALITÉ D'ARTICLES EN MOUSSE MIS EN FORME | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 25.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008043646 (CRYOVAC INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0016] - [0018] - [0023] - [0027] - [0030] , [0032] , [0033] , [0038] , [0044] - [0046] - [0050]; figure 1 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [XY]WO2006053029 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 5 * * page 7, line 13 - page 8, line 26 * * page 11, lines 3-9 * * page 12, lines 8-14,29,30 * * page 13, lines 10-18 * [Y] 3,4,6; | [XA]US2008299379 (MAURER MYRON J [US], et al) [X] 10,11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0015] - [0019] - [0022] - [0034] , [0039] - [0042] * [A] 1-9; | [XA]US6273697 (HARFMANN WALTER R [US]) [X] 10,11 * column 1, lines 11-20 * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 38 * * column 3, lines 6-8,30-31 * * column 5, lines 10-13 * * column 6, lines 15-26 * * column 8, lines 13-35 * [A] 1-9 | by applicant | US4313358 | US5939009 | US4755129 | US4526074 | US5219893 | US3231524 | US3482006 | US4420448 | US5340844 | US5424016 |