EP2374119 - ANIMATED PRODUCT ADVERTISEMENT STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AST Pazarlama Reklam Üretim Sanayi ve Ticaret Limited Sirketi Gazeteciler Mah. Hikaye Sok. No. 13 Esentepe Istanbul / TR | [2011/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TURHAL, Salih Ziya Gokalp Cad. No: 3/22 Kizilay Ankara 06420 / TR | [2014/04] |
Former [2011/41] | 01 /
TURHAL, Salih Ziya Gokalp Cad. No:3/22 Kizilay Ankara 06420 / TR | Representative(s) | Iskender, Ibrahim Destek Patent, Inc. Lefkose Cad. NM Ofis Park B Block No: 36/5 Besevler 16110 Bursa / TR | [2014/37] |
Former [2011/41] | Iskender, Ibrahim Destek Patent Inc. Tophane Ortapazar Cad. No. 7 Zindankapi Sk. No :10 16040 Bursa / TR | Application number, filing date | 10702934.0 | 06.01.2010 | WO2010TR00002 | Priority number, date | TR20090000082 | 07.01.2009 Original published format: TR 200900082 | [2011/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010080076 | Date: | 15.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2374119 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2374119 | Date: | 10.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G09F19/02, G09F19/16, A47F7/03, A47F3/00, A47F3/08 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
G09F19/16 (EP);
A47F3/001 (EP);
A47F3/08 (EP);
A47F7/03 (EP);
G09F19/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | G09F19/02, G09F19/16, A47F7/03 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WERBESTAND FÜR EINE BEWEGLICHE WARE | [2014/03] | English: | ANIMATED PRODUCT ADVERTISEMENT STAND | [2011/41] | French: | STAND PUBLICITAIRE POUR UN PRODUIT ANIMÉ | [2014/03] |
Former [2011/41] | ANIMIERTER PRODUKTWERBUNGSSTÄNDER | ||
Former [2011/41] | SOCLE ANIMÉ POUR PUBLICITÉ DE PRODUIT | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 07.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 29.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2013 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   26.07.2013 | 31.01.2014 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 10.09.2014 | BE | 10.09.2014 | BG | 10.09.2014 | CY | 10.09.2014 | CZ | 10.09.2014 | DK | 10.09.2014 | EE | 10.09.2014 | FI | 10.09.2014 | HR | 10.09.2014 | LT | 10.09.2014 | LV | 10.09.2014 | MK | 10.09.2014 | MT | 10.09.2014 | PL | 10.09.2014 | RO | 10.09.2014 | SE | 10.09.2014 | SI | 10.09.2014 | SK | 10.09.2014 | SM | 10.09.2014 | NO | 10.12.2014 | IE | 06.01.2015 | IT | 06.01.2015 | IS | 10.01.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
BG | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
SM | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.01.2015 | ||
IT | 06.01.2015 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
MT | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.01.2015 | ||
IT | 06.01.2015 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
BE | 10.09.2014 | ||
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.01.2015 | ||
IT | 06.01.2015 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IE | 06.01.2015 | ||
IT | 06.01.2015 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 06.01.2015 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SI | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
DK | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.09.2014 | |
CY | 10.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
PL | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
CZ | 10.09.2014 | ||
EE | 10.09.2014 | ||
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
SK | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
IS | 10.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
RO | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
HR | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
LV | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 10.09.2014 | |
FI | 10.09.2014 | ||
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
NO | 10.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 10.09.2014 | |
LT | 10.09.2014 | ||
SE | 10.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 10.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [I]US1728610 (HORTON ELLSWORTH A) [I] 1-9 * claims 1,2,4 * * page 1, line 1 - line 9 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]CN2455147Y (ZHA BAOJUN [CN]) [A] 1,2,6-8 * abstract *; | [A]US6209242 (MARSHALL ROGER SCOTT [US]) [A] 1,4,6,9 * figures 2,5 * | by applicant | US1728610 |