EP2396005 - SGLT-2 INHIBITOR FOR TREATING TYPE 1 DIABETES MELLITUS, TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS, IMPAIRED GLUCOSE TOLERANCE OR HYPERGLYCEMIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/51] | SGLT-2 INHIBITOR FOR TREATING TYPE 1 DIABETES MELLITUS, TYPE 2 DIABETE MELLITUS, IMPAIRED GLUCOSE TOLERANCE OR HYPERGLYCEMIA | ||
[2012/07] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EICKELMANN, Peter Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 02 /
MARK, Michael Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 03 /
SEMAN, Leo John Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. 900 Ridgebury Road Ridgefield, CT 06877 / US | 04 /
THOMAS, Leo Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 05 /
BROEDL, Uli Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | 06 /
GREMPLER, Rolf Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Lutze, Oliver, et al Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH Binger Straße 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/40] | Simon, Elke Anna Maria, et al Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim GmbH CD Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim Am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 10703287.2 | 11.02.2010 | WO2010EP51734 | Priority number, date | US20090152318P | 13.02.2009 Original published format: US 152318 P | [2011/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010092123 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396005 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7034, A61P3/10, A61P3/04, A61P3/06 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K31/7034 (KR,US);
A61K47/26 (EP);
A61K9/0019 (EP,KR);
A61K9/0031 (KR);
A61K9/02 (KR);
A61K9/2018 (EP);
A61K9/2027 (EP);
A61K9/4866 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | BA | 13.09.2011 | RS | 13.09.2011 | Title | German: | SGLT-2-HEMMER ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON DIABETES MELLITUS TYP 1, DIABETES MELLITUS TYP 2, BEEINTRÄCHTIGER GLUKOSETOLERANZ ODER HYPERGLYKÄMIE | [2011/51] | English: | SGLT-2 INHIBITOR FOR TREATING TYPE 1 DIABETES MELLITUS, TYPE 2 DIABETES MELLITUS, IMPAIRED GLUCOSE TOLERANCE OR HYPERGLYCEMIA | [2012/07] | French: | INHIBITEUR SGLT-2 POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU DIABÈTE SUCRÉ DE TYPE 1, DU DIABÈTE SUCRÉ DE TYPE 2, D'UNE INTOLÉRANCE AU GLUCOSE OU D'UNE HYPERGLYCÉMIE | [2011/51] |
Former [2011/51] | SGLT-2 INHIBITOR FOR TREATING TYPE 1 DIABETES MELLITUS, TYPE 2 DIABETE MELLITUS, IMPAIRED GLUCOSE TOLERANCE OR HYPERGLYCEMIA | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.01.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2016 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 20.03.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 20.03.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.03.2023 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.08.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 31.08.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.09.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.11.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.11.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.12.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 01.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2006064033 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0175] * * paragraph [0178] *; | [XD]WO2006117359 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * claim - * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0019] *; | [X]WO2007014894 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0176] * * paragraph [0332] *; | [XD]WO2007093610 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * paragraph [0209] * * paragraph [0206] * * paragraph [0015] * * paragraph [0322] * * paragraph [0363] *; | [XD]WO2008055870 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XD] 1-15 * claims 10-14 * * example 7 * * page 63, line 20 * * page 60 - line 16 * * page 4, line 23 - line 29 * * page 59, line 7 * * page 60, line 11 *; | [XP]WO2009022007 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [XP] 1-15* claim - * | Examination | WO2005092877 | WO2008055940 | by applicant | WO0127128 | WO03099836 | WO2005092877 | WO2006034489 | WO2006064033 | WO2006117359 | WO2006117360 | WO2006120208 | WO2007025943 | WO2007028814 | WO2007031548 | WO2007093610 | WO2007128749 | WO2008020011 | WO2008049923 | WO2008055870 | WO2008055940 | - FORD ES ET AL., JAMA, (2002), vol. 287, pages 356 - 9 | - KATSUKI A ET AL., DIABETES CARE, (2001), vol. 24, pages 362 - 5 | - MATTHEWS ET AL., DIABETOLOGIA, (1985), vol. 28, pages 412 - 19 | - FORST ET AL., DIABETES, (2003), vol. 52, no. 1, page A459 | - GALVIN P ET AL., DIABET MED, (1992), vol. 9, pages 921 - 8 | - STUMVOLL ET AL., EUR J CLIN INVEST, (2001), vol. 31, pages 380 - 81 | - J. B. MEIGS ET AL., DIABETES, (2003), vol. 52, pages 1475 - 1484 | - The Prevention or Delay of Type 2 Diabetes, AMERICAN DIABETES ASSOCIATION, (2002), vol. 25, pages 742 - 749 | - LAAKSONEN DE ET AL., AM J EPIDEMIOL, (2002), vol. 156, pages 1070 - 7 | - JAMA: JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (2001), vol. 285, pages 2486 - 2497 | - LAAKSONEN DE ET AL., AM J EPIDEMIOL., (2002), vol. 156, pages 1070 - 7 |