EP2389585 - SINGLE MOLECULE PROTEOMICS WITH DYNAMIC PROBES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LI-COR, INC. 4647 Superior Street Lincoln, NE 68504 / US | [2011/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, John, G.K. 6901 Pine Lake Court Lincoln, Nebraska 68516 / US | 02 /
MIDDENDORF, Lyle 8135 Sanborn Drive Lincoln, Nebraska 68505 / US | 03 /
ANDERSON, Jon 4741 Fir Hollow Lane Lincoln, Nebraska 68516 / US | 04 /
STEFFENS, David 2621 N. 75th Street Lincoln, Nebraska 68507 / US | 05 /
OSTERMAN, Harry 4649 Buffalo Creek Road Lincoln, Nebraska 68516 / US | 06 /
GRONE, Daniel 4401 North Park Boulevard Lincoln, Nebraska 68521 / US | [2011/48] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/48] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10703545.3 | 21.01.2010 | WO2010US21625 | Priority number, date | US20090146544P | 22.01.2009 Original published format: US 146544 P | [2011/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010085548 | Date: | 29.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2389585 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/557 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G01N33/557 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | AL | 16.08.2011 | BA | 16.08.2011 | RS | 16.08.2011 | Title | German: | EINZELMOLEKÜL-PROTEOMIK MIT DYNAMISCHEN SONDEN | [2011/48] | English: | SINGLE MOLECULE PROTEOMICS WITH DYNAMIC PROBES | [2011/48] | French: | PROTÉOMIQUE SUR MOLÉCULES INDIVIDUELLES AVEC DES SONDES DYNAMIQUES | [2011/48] | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02072892 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al) [X] 80-96,102,105-107,110-115 * the whole document, in particular claims 22, 23, 27 *; | [XAI] - ADACHI N ET AL, "Enzymological analysis of mutant protein kinase Cgamma causing spinocerebellar ataxia type 14 and dysfunction in Ca2+ homeostasis.", J BIOL CHEM, (20080711), vol. 283, no. 28, pages 19854 - 19863, XP002591131 [X] 1-3,11,12,16,17,26,32-34,39,41,45,46,54,55,59,60,73-75,80-82,90,91,95,96,109-111 * the whole document, in particular abstract; par. "Single-molecule Imaging ..." on p. 19857; par. "C1 Domain Mutant Decreases ..." starting on p. 19859; fig. 7, 8 * [A] 4,5,18-25,27-31,35-38,40,42-44,47,48,61-72,76-79,83,84,97-108,112-115 [I] 6-10,13-15,49-53,56-58,85-89,92-94 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/JBC.M801492200 | [X] - GUNNARSSON A ET AL, "Single-molecule detection and mismatch discrimination of unlabeled DNA targets.", NANO LETT, (200801), vol. 8, no. 1, pages 183 - 188, XP002591132 [X] 80-96,98-101,105-107,110-115 * the whole document, in particular abstract; fig. 1, 5; par. spanning p. 187 and 188 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/NL072401J | [A] - SKINNER G M ET AL, "Single-molecule techniques for drug discovery", ASSAY DRUG DEV TECHN, (200408), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 397 - 405, XP002591133 [A] 1-115 * the whole document * | [A] - LEE S ET AL, "Dual-color prism-type TIRFM system for direct detection of single-biomolecules on nanoarray biochips", CURR APPL PHYS, (20081001), vol. 8, no. 6, pages 700 - 705, XP022941819 [A] 1-115 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cap.2007.04.041 |