EP2394136 - MEASURING DEVICE FOR MEASURING DEFORMATIONS OF ELASTICALLY DEFORMABLE OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FURRER, Bernhardt Gerenweg 8 CH-8352 Elsau / CH | 02 /
IHLEFELD, Joachim Laurinstrasse 6 01067 Dresden / DE | 03 /
KNAUS, Theo Buchelirainstrasse 4 CH-9400 Roschach / CH | 04 /
KLUSER, Christoph Grundstrasse 77 CH-9500 Wil / CH | 05 /
TIEDEKE, Joachim Eichenstrasse 1 8280 Kreuzlingen / CH | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Strauss, Steffen Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2011/50] | Application number, filing date | 10704096.6 | 05.02.2010 | WO2010EP00738 | Priority number, date | DE20091007938 | 06.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009007938 | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089139 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2394136 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/16, F03D7/04 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
G01B11/16 (EP);
F03D17/00 (EP);
F05B2260/80 (EP);
F05B2270/8041 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | MESSVORRICHTUNG ZUM MESSEN VON VERFORMUNGEN ELASTISCH VERFORMBARER OBJEKTE | [2011/50] | English: | MEASURING DEVICE FOR MEASURING DEFORMATIONS OF ELASTICALLY DEFORMABLE OBJECTS | [2011/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE MESURE POUR MESURER DES DÉFORMATIONS D'OBJET POUVANT SUBIR UNE DÉFORMATION ÉLASTIQUE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 24.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 04.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ID]EP1333402 (BAUMER OPTRONIC GMBH [DE]) [ID] 1-22 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0069]; figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0097] *; | [A]DE102006002708 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-22 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2008092461 (LM GLASFIBER AS [DK], et al) [A] 1-22 * page 7, line 26 - page 14, line 9; figures 1-8 *; | [AD]EP1742015 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [AD] 1-22 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-2 *; | [AD]US7377181 (CHRIST JR ROBERT J [US], et al) [AD] 1-22 * column 2, line 4 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP1742015 | WO2004038328 | EP1361445 | US7377181 | EP1333402 |