EP2393525 - INTRAOCULAR LENSES TREATED WITH ALKYLPHOSPHOCHOLINES FOR PHARMACOLOGICAL AFTER-CATARACT PROPHYLAXIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eibl-Lindner, Kirsten Silberblattstrasse 18A 81377 München / DE | For all designated states Kampik, Anselm Gasparistrasse 2 81479 München / DE | For all designated states Eibl, Hansjörg Heinrich-Deppe-Ring 22 37120 Bovenden / DE | [2015/46] |
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München Geschwister-Scholl-Platz 1 80539 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Ludwig-Maximilians-Universität München Geschwister-Scholl-Platz 1 80359 München / DE | ||
For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgartenstrasse 8 80539 München / DE | |||
Former [N/P] | For all designated states Max-Planck-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der Wissenschaften e.V. Hofgarten 8 80539 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EIBL-LINDNER, Kirsten Silberblattstr. 18a 81377 München / DE | 02 /
KAMPIK, Anselm Gasparistr. 2 81479 München / DE | 03 /
EIBL, Hansjörg Heinrich-Deppe-Ring 22 37120 Bovenden / DE | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Dey, Michael, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10704129.5 | 08.02.2010 | WO2010EP51490 | Priority number, date | DE20091007853 | 06.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009007853 | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010089389 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2393525 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393525 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/54, A61L31/16 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61L2300/216 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | A61L27/12, A61L27/32, A61L27/50, A61L31/08, A61L31/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | 05.09.2011 | BA | 05.09.2011 | RS | 05.09.2011 | Title | German: | MIT ALKYLPHOSPHOCHOLINEN BEHANDELTE INTRAOKULARLINSEN ZUR PHARMAKOLOGISCHEN NACHSTARPROPHYLAXE | [2011/50] | English: | INTRAOCULAR LENSES TREATED WITH ALKYLPHOSPHOCHOLINES FOR PHARMACOLOGICAL AFTER-CATARACT PROPHYLAXIS | [2011/50] | French: | LENTILLES INTRAOCULAIRES TRAITÉES AVEC DES ALKYL-PHOSPHOCHOLINES POUR UN EFFET PROPHYLACTIQUE DE LA CATARACTE SECONDAIRE | [2014/34] |
Former [2011/50] | LENTILLES INTRAOCULAIRES TRAITÉES AUX ALKYL-PHOSPHOCHOLINES POUR UNE PROPHYLAXIE PHARMACOLOGIQUE DE LA CATARACTE SECONDAIRE | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 19.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.02.2010 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | IT | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | IE | 08.02.2015 | LU | 08.02.2015 | BE | 28.02.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | PT | 07.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2018/02] | HU | 08.02.2010 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
LU | 08.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
PT | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 08.02.2010 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
PT | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
IE | 08.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 07.01.2015 | |
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 28.02.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5342621 (EURY ROBERT P [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,9,11,12,14 * column 3, lines 5-66 * * column 4, lines 41-48 * * claim - *; | [X]US2003219909 (LALLY JOHN MARTIN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-9,11,12,14 * page 1, paragraphs 9-10 * * page 2, paragraphs 19-21 * * page 3, paragraphs 27-32 * * claim - *; | [XDA]US2008090781 (EIBL HANS JOERG [DE], et al) [XD] 16,18 * page 8, paragraph 82 - page 9, paragraph 89 * * claims 1,15 * [A] 1-15,17 | [XI] - SHIGETA ET AL, "Suppression of fibroblast and bacterial adhesion by MPC coating on acrylic intraocular lenses", JOURNAL CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY, SURGERY, FAIRFAX, VA, US, (20060501), vol. 32, no. 5, ISSN 0886-3350, pages 859 - 866, XP005488905 [X] 1-5,7,8,11-17 * the whole document * [I] 10 | by applicant | EP1827379 | - KLEIN ET AL., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (1984), vol. 91, pages 1 - 9 | - KUGELBERG ET AL., J CAT REFRACT SURG, (2005), vol. 31, pages 757 - 762 | - MASTROPASQUA ET AL., ACTA OPHTHALMOL SCAND, (2007), vol. 85, pages 409 - 414 | - CLEARY; SPALTON, ESCRS EUROTIMES, (2008), vol. 115, pages 1308 - 1314 |