EP2393668 - SECURITY FEATURE FOR DOCUMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/50] | SECURITY FEATURE FOR PLASTIC-BASED VALUE OR SECURITY DOCUMENT | ||
[2015/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bundesdruckerei GmbH Oranienstrasse 91 10969 Berlin / DE | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIJO BOLLIN, Hans-Peter Rotherstrasse 5 10245 Berlin / DE | 02 /
LEOPOLD, André Angermünder Strasse 11 10119Berlin / DE | 03 /
MÄRTENS, Detlef An den Haselbüschen 19 13599 Berlin / DE | 04 /
GAHLBECK, Jeffry Heidekampweg 8 12437 Berlin / DE | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner mbB Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | [2015/26] |
Former [2011/50] | Patentanwälte Bressel und Partner Potsdamer Platz 10 10785 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 10704330.9 | 03.02.2010 | WO2010EP00954 | Priority number, date | DE20091007779 | 04.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009007779 | [2011/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010089155 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2393668 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2393668 | Date: | 24.06.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B42D15/00 | [2011/50] | CPC: |
B42D25/29 (EP);
B42D25/351 (EP);
B42D25/36 (EP);
B42D25/378 (EP);
B42D25/405 (EP);
B42D25/425 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSMERKMAL FÜR DOKUMENT UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DESSEN | [2015/10] | English: | SECURITY FEATURE FOR DOCUMENT AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING IT | [2015/10] | French: | SIGNE DE SÉCURITÉ POUR DOCUMENT ET MÉTHODE POUR LE FABRIQUER | [2015/10] |
Former [2011/50] | SICHERHEITSMERKMAL FÜR KUNSTSTOFFBASIERENDES WERT- ODER SICHERHEITSDOKUMENT | ||
Former [2011/50] | SECURITY FEATURE FOR PLASTIC-BASED VALUE OR SECURITY DOCUMENT | ||
Former [2011/50] | SIGNE DE SÉCURITÉ POUR DOCUMENT DE VALEUR OU DE SÉCURITÉ À BASE DE MATIÈRE PLASTIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 03.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 02.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 29.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.02.2010 | CY | 24.06.2015 | CZ | 24.06.2015 | DK | 24.06.2015 | EE | 24.06.2015 | ES | 24.06.2015 | FI | 24.06.2015 | HR | 24.06.2015 | IT | 24.06.2015 | LT | 24.06.2015 | LV | 24.06.2015 | MC | 24.06.2015 | MK | 24.06.2015 | MT | 24.06.2015 | NL | 24.06.2015 | PL | 24.06.2015 | RO | 24.06.2015 | SE | 24.06.2015 | SI | 24.06.2015 | SK | 24.06.2015 | SM | 24.06.2015 | TR | 24.06.2015 | BG | 24.09.2015 | NO | 24.09.2015 | GR | 25.09.2015 | IS | 24.10.2015 | PT | 26.10.2015 | IE | 03.02.2016 | LU | 03.02.2016 | BE | 29.02.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 03.02.2010 | |
CY | 24.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 24.06.2015 | ||
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MK | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
SM | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
MT | 24.06.2015 | ||
NL | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SE | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
IE | 03.02.2016 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/43] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
LU | 03.02.2016 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
MC | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SI | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
BE | 29.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
IT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
DK | 24.06.2015 | ||
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 24.06.2015 | |
EE | 24.06.2015 | ||
ES | 24.06.2015 | ||
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
PL | 24.06.2015 | ||
RO | 24.06.2015 | ||
SK | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
IS | 24.10.2015 | ||
PT | 26.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 24.06.2015 | |
FI | 24.06.2015 | ||
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
BG | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 24.06.2015 | |
HR | 24.06.2015 | ||
LT | 24.06.2015 | ||
LV | 24.06.2015 | ||
NO | 24.09.2015 | ||
GR | 25.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [I]US2007098959 (LIEBERMAN DANIEL [US]) [I] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [I]FR2893424 (ARJOWIGGINS SOC PAR ACTIONS SI [FR], et al) [I] 1-31 * page 9, line 28 - line 31 * * page 10, line 16 - line 19 * * page 14, line 5 - line 17; figures 10-12 *; | [XI]US2008231976 (COMMANDER LAWRENCE GEORGE [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,10,13-15,17,19,20,22,25,29-31 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0116]; figure 37 *[I] 3,6,8,9,11,12,16,18,21,23,24,26-28 | by applicant | DE3231460 | DE10013410 | WO2008098753 |