EP2398569 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING AND SEPARATING A CHEMICAL TARGET COMPOUND IN A SUSPENSION OF THEIR CRYSTALS IN THE MOTHER LIQUOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEILEK, Jörg Im Schlag 17 69245 Bammental / DE | 02 /
SCHNEIDER, Wolfgang An der Ameisenhalde 17 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 03 /
GUNKEL, Wolfgang Starke Hoffnung 18a 68305 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
SCHLIEPHAKE, Volker Kaiser-Konrad-Str.29 67105 Schifferstadt / DE | 05 /
MÜLLER-ENGEL, Klaus Joachim Bahnhofstr. 82 76297 Stutensee / DE | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 10704553.6 | 15.02.2010 | WO2010EP51828 | Priority number, date | DE20091000987 | 18.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009000987 | US20090153339P | 18.02.2009 Original published format: US 153339 P | [2011/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010094637 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398569 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398569 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D9/00, F16C17/04 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
B01D9/005 (EP,US);
B01D9/00 (KR);
B01D9/004 (EP,US);
B01D9/0045 (EP,US);
F16C17/04 (KR);
F16C19/545 (EP,US);
F16C23/086 (EP,US);
F16C19/30 (EP,US);
F16C19/38 (EP);
F16C19/56 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REINIGENDEN ABTRENNEN EINER CHEMISCHEN ZIELVERBINDUNG AUS EINER SUSPENSION IHRER KRISTALLE IN MUTTERLAUGE | [2011/52] | English: | METHOD FOR PURIFYING AND SEPARATING A CHEMICAL TARGET COMPOUND IN A SUSPENSION OF THEIR CRYSTALS IN THE MOTHER LIQUOR | [2011/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SÉPARATION ET PURIFICATION D'UN COMPOSÉ CHIMIQUE CIBLE CONTENU DANS UNE SUSPENSION DE SES CRISTAUX DANS LA LIQUEUR MÈRE | [2011/52] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2010 | BG | 25.12.2013 | CY | 25.12.2013 | CZ | 25.12.2013 | DK | 25.12.2013 | EE | 25.12.2013 | ES | 25.12.2013 | FI | 25.12.2013 | HR | 25.12.2013 | IT | 25.12.2013 | LT | 25.12.2013 | LV | 25.12.2013 | MC | 25.12.2013 | MK | 25.12.2013 | MT | 25.12.2013 | NL | 25.12.2013 | PL | 25.12.2013 | RO | 25.12.2013 | SE | 25.12.2013 | SI | 25.12.2013 | SK | 25.12.2013 | SM | 25.12.2013 | TR | 25.12.2013 | IE | 15.02.2014 | LU | 15.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | GB | 25.03.2014 | NO | 25.03.2014 | GR | 26.03.2014 | IS | 25.04.2014 | PT | 28.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
TR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
BG | 25.12.2013 | ||
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
IT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 25.12.2013 | |
CY | 25.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
GR | 26.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
SM | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
MT | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SI | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
GB | 25.03.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
IE | 15.02.2014 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
PL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
DK | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
MC | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.02.2014 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
NL | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 25.12.2013 | |
CZ | 25.12.2013 | ||
EE | 25.12.2013 | ||
ES | 25.12.2013 | ||
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
RO | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
SK | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
PT | 28.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 25.12.2013 | |
FI | 25.12.2013 | ||
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
IS | 25.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
LV | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
HR | 25.12.2013 | ||
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 25.12.2013 | |
LT | 25.12.2013 | ||
SE | 25.12.2013 | ||
NO | 25.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 25.12.2013 | |
NO | 25.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XD]EP1448282 (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-18,20,21 * paragraph [0047] *; | [A]US4787985 (ROODENRIJS JACOBUS P [NL], et al) [A] 1-21 * column 8, lines 10-19 *; | [A]EP0373720 (GRASSO KONINKL MASCHF [NL]) [A] 1-21 * page 3, lines 43-49 * | by applicant | WO2009148314 | WO0177056 | WO2004035514 | WO03041833 | WO0209839 | WO03041832 | DE10036881 | WO02055469 | WO03078378 | DE102005018702 | EP1448282 | DE102007043758 | DE102007043748 | DE102007004960 | DE102007043759 | WO2006111565 | DE10228859 | DE102005003115 | DE102007028333 | DE102007028332 | EP1448282 | - CHEM.-ING. TECHN., (1985), vol. 57 | - Chemical Engineering Science, ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., (1995), vol. 50, pages 2712 - 2729 | - Applied Thermal Engineering, VERLAG ELSEVIER SCIENCE LTD., (1997), vol. 17, pages 879 - 888 | - E. MAYER, "Berechnung und Konstruktion von axialen Gleitringdichtungen", KONSTRUKTION, (1968), vol. 20, pages 213 - 319 | US20090153339 |