EP2403740 - SUPPORTING FOOT FOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/02] | SUPPORTING FOOT FOR VEHICLES | ||
[2013/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.2014 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAF-HOLLAND GmbH Hauptstrasse 26 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHRIST, Armin Kolpingstr. 7 63856 Bessenbach / DE | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | Bauer, Clemens, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10704570.0 | 19.02.2010 | WO2010EP52091 | Priority number, date | DE20091001299 | 03.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009001299 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010100038 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403740 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403740 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60S9/02 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
B60S9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STÜTZFUSS FÜR FAHRZEUGE | [2012/02] | English: | SUPPORTING FOOT FOR VEHICLES | [2013/51] | French: | ASSEMBLAGE DE PIED DE SUPPORT DE VEHICULE | [2013/30] |
Former [2012/02] | SUPPORTING FOOT FOR VEHICLES | ||
Former [2012/02] | BÉQUILLE POUR VÉHICULES | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 17.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2010 | BG | 18.12.2013 | CY | 18.12.2013 | CZ | 18.12.2013 | DK | 18.12.2013 | EE | 18.12.2013 | ES | 18.12.2013 | FI | 18.12.2013 | HR | 18.12.2013 | IT | 18.12.2013 | LT | 18.12.2013 | LV | 18.12.2013 | MC | 18.12.2013 | MK | 18.12.2013 | MT | 18.12.2013 | NL | 18.12.2013 | PL | 18.12.2013 | RO | 18.12.2013 | SE | 18.12.2013 | SI | 18.12.2013 | SK | 18.12.2013 | SM | 18.12.2013 | TR | 18.12.2013 | IE | 19.02.2014 | LU | 19.02.2014 | BE | 28.02.2014 | CH | 28.02.2014 | LI | 28.02.2014 | NO | 18.03.2014 | GR | 19.03.2014 | IS | 18.04.2014 | PT | 18.04.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 19.02.2010 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
TR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 19.02.2010 | |
BG | 18.12.2013 | ||
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/29] | BG | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
IT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 18.12.2013 | |
CY | 18.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
GR | 19.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
SM | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
MT | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SI | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
IE | 19.02.2014 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
DK | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
CH | 28.02.2014 | ||
LI | 28.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/44] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
MC | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
LU | 19.02.2014 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
NL | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 18.12.2013 | |
CZ | 18.12.2013 | ||
EE | 18.12.2013 | ||
ES | 18.12.2013 | ||
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
PL | 18.12.2013 | ||
RO | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
SK | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
PT | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 18.12.2013 | |
FI | 18.12.2013 | ||
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
IS | 18.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
LV | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
HR | 18.12.2013 | ||
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 18.12.2013 | |
LT | 18.12.2013 | ||
SE | 18.12.2013 | ||
NO | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 18.12.2013 | |
NO | 18.03.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4078774 (WILLIAMS HUGH M) [Y] 1,4,12 * column 2, line 27 - column 3, line 31; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE3642079 (HAACON HEBETECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,12 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE3734073 (FRUEHAUF CORP [US]) [A] 1,12 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2207102 (IND MACHINERY SUPPLIES LIMITED) [A] 1,12* figures 1-10 *; | [YD]DE4003414 (JOST WERKE GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1,4,12 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 32; figures 1-3 * |