EP2396535 - PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE ACTUATOR, AND INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Automotive GmbH Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [2011/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNRUH, Marcus Kellerweg 11 93197 Zeitlarn / DE | 02 /
ZUMSTRULL, Claus Zum Vogelherd 3 93128 Regenstauf / DE | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/51] | Application number, filing date | 10705137.7 | 15.02.2010 | WO2010EP51846 | Priority number, date | DE20091009164 | 16.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009009164 | [2011/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010092170 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396535 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2396535 | Date: | 08.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/00, F02M51/06, F02M63/00, F02M47/02, H01L41/053, H01L41/047 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
F02M63/0026 (EP);
F02M51/005 (EP);
H10N30/875 (EP);
H10N30/883 (EP);
H10N30/886 (EP);
F02M2200/21 (EP);
F02M2200/8038 (EP);
F02M2200/9015 (EP);
F02M47/027 (EP);
H10N30/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/51] | F02M51/00, F02M51/06, F02M63/00, F02M47/02, H01L41/053 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHER AKTOR, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DES AKTORS UND INJEKTOR | [2011/51] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR, METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE ACTUATOR, AND INJECTOR | [2011/51] | French: | ACTIONNEUR PIEZOELECTRIQUE, PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE L'ACTIONNEUR ET INJECTEUR | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 20.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2010 | BG | 08.04.2015 | CY | 08.04.2015 | CZ | 08.04.2015 | DK | 08.04.2015 | EE | 08.04.2015 | ES | 08.04.2015 | FI | 08.04.2015 | HR | 08.04.2015 | LT | 08.04.2015 | LV | 08.04.2015 | MC | 08.04.2015 | MK | 08.04.2015 | MT | 08.04.2015 | NL | 08.04.2015 | PL | 08.04.2015 | RO | 08.04.2015 | SE | 08.04.2015 | SI | 08.04.2015 | SK | 08.04.2015 | SM | 08.04.2015 | TR | 08.04.2015 | NO | 08.07.2015 | GR | 09.07.2015 | IS | 08.08.2015 | PT | 10.08.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
TR | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.02.2010 | |
CY | 08.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.04.2015 | ||
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MK | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
SM | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
MT | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SE | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/42] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
MC | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SI | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 08.04.2015 | |
DK | 08.04.2015 | ||
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
PL | 08.04.2015 | ||
RO | 08.04.2015 | ||
SK | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
EE | 08.04.2015 | ||
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 08.04.2015 | |
ES | 08.04.2015 | ||
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
IS | 08.08.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 08.04.2015 | |
FI | 08.04.2015 | ||
HR | 08.04.2015 | ||
LT | 08.04.2015 | ||
LV | 08.04.2015 | ||
NL | 08.04.2015 | ||
NO | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.07.2015 | ||
PT | 10.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 08.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH07226544 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [I]WO0052769 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al); | [A]WO0214679 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al); | [A]DE102005051438 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) |