EP2403702 - EXTRUDED POLYMER FOAM PROCESS WITH STAGED FORMING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2012/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WURTZ, Bertrand 3 rue des Chenes F-67850 Offendorf / FR | 02 /
VO, Van-Chau 42A rue du Canal F-67460 Souffelweyersheim / FR | [2019/26] |
Former [2012/02] | 01 /
WURTZ, Bertrand 3 rue des Chenes F-67850 Offendorf / FR | ||
02 /
VO, Van-Chau 42A Rue du Canal F-67460 Souffelweyersheim / FR | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [2019/26] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2012/02] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place GB-London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10705526.1 | 24.02.2010 | [2019/26] | WO2010US25187 | Priority number, date | US20090157217P | 04.03.2009 Original published format: US 157217 P | [2012/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010101747 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2403702 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403702 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/26, B29C44/34, // B29C44/50, B29K25/00, B29K105/00 | [2018/43] | CPC: |
B29C44/26 (EP,US);
B29C44/3496 (EP,US);
B29C44/50 (EP,US);
B29K2025/00 (EP,US);
B29K2105/0085 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0045 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/02] | B29C44/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STUFENWEISEN HERSTELLUNG VON EXTRUDIERTEM POLYMERSCHAUMSTOFF | [2012/02] | English: | EXTRUDED POLYMER FOAM PROCESS WITH STAGED FORMING | [2012/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION PAR ÉTAPES DE MOUSSE POLYMÈRE EXTRUDÉE | [2012/02] | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 09.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 07.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.02.2010 | AT | 26.06.2019 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | ES | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | HR | 26.06.2019 | IT | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | MK | 26.06.2019 | MT | 26.06.2019 | NL | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | SE | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | SM | 26.06.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | NO | 26.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | IE | 24.02.2020 | LU | 24.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 24.02.2010 | |
AT | 26.06.2019 | ||
CY | 26.06.2019 | ||
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
MT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 24.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 24.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IE | 24.02.2020 | ||
LU | 24.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
LU | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
SM | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
IT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
ES | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
NL | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
HR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
SE | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
NO | 26.09.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4435345 (COLOMBO ROBERTO [IT]) [X] 1-5,9,10 * column 2, line 35 - column 3 * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 24 * * column 6, lines 5-8; figure 1 *; | [XI]US4536357 (HAYASHI MOTOSHIGE [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9,10 * column 1, lines 7-9 * * column 2, lines 24-38 * * column 3, line 60 - column 5, line 20 * * column 7, lines 27-35; figures 1,2,4 * [I] 2,6-8; | [XI]US2002048614 (KITAYAMA TAKEO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0010] - [0015] - [0036] , [0037] , [0045] , [0046] , [0051] , [0098] , [0103] , [0105] , [0113] - [0118] - [0121] - [0123]; figures 7,9,10 * [I] 2,6,7; | [A]US2006022366 (IWAMOTO AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 6,7* abstract * |