EP2408626 - STYRENE BUTADIENE RUBBER WITH NOVEL STYRENE INCORPORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Styron Europe GmbH Bachtobelstrasse 3 8810 Horgen / CH | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAMANN, Evemarie Prager Str. 31a 06128 Halle / DE | 02 /
BARTOSSEK, Hagen, Thomas Hallesche Str. 52 06258 Schkopau / DE | 03 /
KIESEKAMP, Joachim Max-von-Laue-Ring 56 30627 Hannover / DE | [2012/09] |
Former [2012/04] | 01 /
HAMANN, Evemarie Prager Str. 31a 06128 Halle / DE | ||
02 /
BARTOSSEK, Hagen, Thomas Hallesche Str. 52 06258 Schkopau / DE | |||
03 /
KIESEKAMP, Joachim Max-von-laue-ring 56 30627 Hannover / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10705757.2 | 24.02.2010 | WO2010US25150 | Priority number, date | US20090161680P | 19.03.2009 Original published format: US 161680 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010107555 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408626 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2408626 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08C19/44, C08F236/10, B60C1/00, C08F297/04, C08L9/06, C08L15/00 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
C08L9/06 (EP,KR,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,KR,US);
C08C19/20 (KR);
C08C19/44 (EP,US);
C08F236/10 (EP,US);
C08F297/04 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (KR);
C08K3/04 (KR);
C08K3/36 (KR);
C08L15/00 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,KR,US);
Y02T10/86 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F236/10, C08F2/001 (EP,US);
C08L15/00, C08L2666/02 (US,EP);
C08L9/06, C08L2666/02 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2012/04] | B60C1/00, C08F236/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STYROL-BUTADIEN-KAUTSCHUK MIT NEUEM STYROLEINBAU | [2012/04] | English: | STYRENE BUTADIENE RUBBER WITH NOVEL STYRENE INCORPORATION | [2012/04] | French: | CAOUTCHOUC STYRÈNE-BUTADIÈNE À NOUVELLE INCORPORATION DE STYRÈNE | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 10.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.05.2013 | CY | 08.05.2013 | DK | 08.05.2013 | EE | 08.05.2013 | FI | 08.05.2013 | HR | 08.05.2013 | LT | 08.05.2013 | LV | 08.05.2013 | MC | 08.05.2013 | MK | 08.05.2013 | MT | 08.05.2013 | SE | 08.05.2013 | SI | 08.05.2013 | SM | 08.05.2013 | TR | 08.05.2013 | BG | 08.08.2013 | NO | 08.08.2013 | GR | 09.08.2013 | IS | 08.09.2013 | PT | 09.09.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
TR | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
SM | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
MT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/44] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
MC | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
DK | 08.05.2013 | ||
EE | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
LV | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
CY | 08.05.2013 | ||
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
HR | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
BG | 08.08.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
FI | 08.05.2013 | ||
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
SE | 08.05.2013 | ||
SI | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
GR | 09.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.05.2013 | |
LT | 08.05.2013 | ||
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
IS | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 08.05.2013 | |
NO | 08.08.2013 | ||
PT | 09.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB2158076 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-20 * page 2, line 62 - page 3, line 8; examples 1-23; claim 1 * * line 56 - page 9, line 17 *; | [X]EP0263054 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 36; examples 15,16,17,19,21,22,23,24; claims 1-10 * * column 7, line 28 - column 8, line 56 *; | [X]EP0483046 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [X] 1-20 * column 1, line 50 - column 2, line 24; examples 2,3,4; claim 1 *; | [X]US4396743 (FUJIMAKI TATSUO [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 5, line 41 - column 6, line 4; example 1; claims 1,2; table 1 * | by applicant | DE2247470 | GB2158076 | EP0263054 | EP0483046 | US4396743 |