EP2398704 - AIRCRAFT WING LOAD ALLEVIATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited Pegasus House Aerospace Avenue Filton Bristol BS34 7PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Airbus Operations Limited New Filton House Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Yukitaka Airbus Operations Limited New Filton House Filton Bristol BS99 7AR / GB | [2011/52] | Representative(s) | Ribeiro, James Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/14] | Ribeiro, James Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2011/52] | Ribeiro, James Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 Hays Lane London Greater London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 10706037.8 | 16.02.2010 | WO2010GB50253 | Priority number, date | GB20090002685 | 18.02.2009 Original published format: GB 0902685 | [2011/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010094952 | Date: | 26.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2398704 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2398704 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B64C9/32, B64C13/16, B64C9/34, B64C9/10 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
B64C13/16 (EP,US);
B64C9/10 (EP,US);
B64C9/323 (EP,US);
B64C9/34 (EP,US);
Y02T50/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ERLEICHTERUNG DER TRAGFLÄCHENBELASTUNG | [2013/14] | English: | AIRCRAFT WING LOAD ALLEVIATION SYSTEM | [2011/52] | French: | SYSTEME D'ATTENUATION DE LA CHARGE ALAIRE | [2013/14] |
Former [2011/52] | FLUGZEUGFLÜGELENTLASTUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2011/52] | SYSTÈME D'ALLÈGEMENT DE LA CHARGE SUR UNE VOILURE D'AÉRONEF | Entry into regional phase | 16.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 16.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/52] | 17.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 07.01.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 07.01.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 07.01.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.01.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2010 | AT | 02.04.2014 | BE | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | DK | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | ES | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | IT | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MK | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | NL | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | SM | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | NO | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.02.2010 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
BE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
DK | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
ES | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
NL | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
NO | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2007114327 (DEES PAUL W [US], et al) [Y] 1-5,11-16 * abstract * * figures 3-5 *; | [Y]US3628756 (JOHNSON RICHARD M) [Y] 1-5,11-16 * figures 2-5 *; | [A]GB581876 (BLACKBURN AIRCRAFT LTD, et al) [A] 1-5,11-13,15,16 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP0127963 (SECR DEFENCE BRIT [GB]) [A] 1-3,14-16 * the whole document * |