EP2396357 - TWO-PACK POLYURETHANE PAINT FOR BACKING FILMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Deletion: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covestro Deutschland AG Kaiser-Wilhelm-Allee 60 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2015/45] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLEIN, Andreas Beckers Kämpchen 9 51371 Leverkusen / DE | 02 /
PETZOLDT, Joachim Iltisstrasse 2 40789 Monheim / DE | 03 /
YUVA, Nusret Nagelsbaum 47 e 51399 Burscheid / DE | 04 /
IRLE, Christoph Lane 418, Jin Xiu Dong Lu 253 200135 Shanghai / CN | [2011/51] | Representative(s) | Levpat c/o Covestro AG Gebäude 4825 51365 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | BIP Patents Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10706146.7 | 05.02.2010 | WO2010EP00957 | Priority number, date | EP20090001801 | 10.02.2009 Original published format: EP 09001801 | [2011/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010091898 | Date: | 19.08.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2396357 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/12, C08G18/77, C08G18/44, C09D175/04, C08J7/04 | [2011/51] | CPC: |
C08G18/0823 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (KR);
C08G18/12 (EP,US);
C08G18/4216 (EP,US);
C08G18/44 (EP,US);
C08G18/664 (EP,US);
C08G18/6659 (EP,US);
C08G18/73 (EP,US);
C08J7/04 (KR);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (KR);
C08L69/00 (KR);
C08L75/04 (KR);
C09D167/00 (KR);
C09D169/00 (KR);
C09D175/06 (EP,US);
C09D7/65 (KR);
C08J2467/00 (KR);
C08J2469/00 (KR);
C08J2475/04 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/12, C08G18/2875 (US,EP);
C08G18/12, C08G18/706 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/51] | Title | German: | 2K-POLYURETHAN-LACK FÜR TRÄGERFOLIEN | [2011/51] | English: | TWO-PACK POLYURETHANE PAINT FOR BACKING FILMS | [2011/51] | French: | VERNIS DE POLYURÉTHANE À DEUX COMPOSANTS (2K) POUR DES FILMS DE SUPPORT | [2011/51] | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2011 | Examination requested [2011/51] | 15.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0669352 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 4, line 10, paragraphs 116,127,137 - page 6, line 54; claims 1,3 *; | [X]EP1418192 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 10, line 5 - line 30 *; | [X]EP1647399 (BAYER MATERIALSCIENCE AG [DE]) [X] 1-9 * page 11, line 45 - page 12, line 30; example 1 ** page 14, line 15 - line 20 * | by applicant | DE1495730 | DE1300266 | US3737409 | US4108814 | DE3840542 | EP0540985 | EP0959087 | WO0015718 | WO0026274 | DE10007821 | DE10024624 | EP1404740 | EP1477508 | WO2005099943 | EP1647399 | - M. STICKLER; T. RHEIN, Ullmann's Encyclopedia of Industrial Chemistry, VCH PUBLISHERS, (1992), vol. 21, pages 473 - 486 |