EP2393999 - MODULAR ASSEMBLY SHELTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.02.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blue Planet Buildings (UK) Limited 57 Front Street, Arnold Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG5 7EA / GB | [2011/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILSON, Derick The White House 101 Nottingham Road Kimberley Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG16 2ND / GB | [2011/50] | Representative(s) | Franks & Co (South) Limited Carlton House 26 Billing Road Northampton NN1 5AT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Franks & Co (South) Limited Carlton House 26 Billing Road Northampton NN1 5AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10706705.0 | 03.02.2010 | WO2010GB00175 | Priority number, date | GB20090001880 | 05.02.2009 Original published format: GB 0901880 | [2011/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010089535 | Date: | 12.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2393999 | Date: | 14.12.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/343, E04H1/12, E04H1/00, E04H1/02, H02S20/23, H02J7/35 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
E04B1/34315 (EP,US);
E04H1/1205 (EP,US);
H02S20/23 (EP,US);
E04B1/34317 (EP,US);
H02J7/35 (EP,US);
Y02B10/10 (EP,US);
Y02E10/56 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/50] | E04B1/343, E04H1/00, E04H1/02, E04H1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2011/50] | Title | German: | UNTERKUNFT MIT MODULARER MONTAGE | [2011/50] | English: | MODULAR ASSEMBLY SHELTER | [2011/50] | French: | ABRI À ASSEMBLAGE MODULAIRE | [2011/50] | Entry into regional phase | 15.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/50] | 07.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/11] | 27.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2150170 (MOOJEN LINDSAY GEOFFREY) [A] 2,3* figure 21 *; | [Y]US2003009954 (BRADLEY CHUCK [US]) [Y] 1,8,12,14,15,18 * paragraph [0030] *; | [Y]DE10300656 (DIETERLE HANS GEORG [DE]) [Y] 4,5 * paragraph [0012] *; | [Y]DE102004020023 (AZ IMMOCON GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,8,12,14,15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0022] , [ 0024] , [ 0025] , [ 0028] , [ 0032] *; | [A]WO2008005307 (BURNS GREGORY [US]) [A] 2,3 * figure 9 *; | [XYI]JP2008184801 (OKAMURA SEIJI, et al) [X] 1,6-8,10,11,13,16,17,20-23 * figures 1-7 * * paragraphs [0033] , [ 0034] * [Y] 1,4,5,8,12,14,15,18 [I] 9,19 |