EP2403361 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CAROTENOID SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/02] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CAROTENOID SOLUTIONS V | ||
[2012/31] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.2013 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2012/02] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGEL, Robert Im Erlich 76 67346 Speyer / DE | 02 /
RUMPF, Bernd Arthur Geiss Str. 30 68766 Hockenheim / DE | [2012/02] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2012/02] | Application number, filing date | 10707006.2 | 03.03.2010 | WO2010EP52692 | Priority number, date | EP20090154304 | 04.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09154304 | [2012/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010100188 | Date: | 10.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2403361 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2403361 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/275, F28D3/00, C07C403/24 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
A23K20/179 (EP);
A23L33/105 (EP);
A23L5/44 (EP);
C07C403/24 (EP);
C09B61/00 (EP);
F28D3/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CAROTINOID-LÖSUNGEN | [2012/31] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CAROTENOID SOLUTIONS | [2012/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SOLUTIONS DE CAROTÉNOÏDE | [2012/31] |
Former [2012/02] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CAROTINOID-LÖSUNGEN V | ||
Former [2012/02] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CAROTENOID SOLUTIONS V | ||
Former [2012/02] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE SOLUTIONS DE CAROTÉNOÏDE V | Entry into regional phase | 04.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 04.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/02] | 27.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 27.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.03.2010 | CY | 26.12.2012 | CZ | 26.12.2012 | EE | 26.12.2012 | FI | 26.12.2012 | HR | 26.12.2012 | LT | 26.12.2012 | LV | 26.12.2012 | MK | 26.12.2012 | MT | 26.12.2012 | PL | 26.12.2012 | RO | 26.12.2012 | SE | 26.12.2012 | SI | 26.12.2012 | SK | 26.12.2012 | SM | 26.12.2012 | TR | 26.12.2012 | IE | 03.03.2013 | LU | 03.03.2013 | BG | 26.03.2013 | GR | 27.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | IS | 26.04.2013 | PT | 26.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MK | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
TR | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
SM | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
MT | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
IE | 03.03.2013 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 26.12.2012 | |
CZ | 26.12.2012 | ||
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
PT | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
RO | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
PL | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CZ | 26.12.2012 | |
EE | 26.12.2012 | ||
FI | 26.12.2012 | ||
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
SK | 26.12.2012 | ||
BG | 26.03.2013 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
IS | 26.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
SI | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
GR | 27.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
HR | 26.12.2012 | ||
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
LV | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 26.12.2012 | |
LT | 26.12.2012 | ||
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 26.12.2012 | |
SE | 26.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 26.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2006125591 (PHARES PHARM RES NV [NL], et al) [AD] 1-23 * page 14, line 10 - page 20, line 23 *; | [A]US2001008644 (STEIN HERMANN [CH], et al) [A] 1-23 * examples 1, 2; claim 1 * | by applicant | WO2006125591 | - CHEMIE-ING. TECH., (1970), page 349 |