EP2391381 - USE OF A SYNERGISTIC COMBINATION OF HYPOTHIOCYANITE AND/OR HYPOHALITE IONS AND LACTOFERRIN FOR PREPARING A TREATMENT FOR CYSTIC FIBROSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/49] | Use of a synergistic combination of hypothiocyanite and/or hypohalite ions and lactoferrin for preparing a treatment for cystic fibrosis | ||
[2015/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alaxia 60 Avenue Rockefeller Bâtiment Adenine 69008 Lyon / FR | [2015/41] |
Former [2012/40] | For all designated states Alaxia 60 Avenue Rockefeller Bâtiment Adenine 69008 Lyon / FR | ||
Former [2011/49] | For all designated states Alaxia 9 et 11 rue de la Perlerie 69120 Vaulx en Velin / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORDEAU, Philippe 46 Allée Chantalouette F-69330 Meyzieu / FR | 02 /
PERRAUDIN, Jean-Paul 9 avenue de la Ferme Rose B-1180 Bruxelles / BE | [2011/49] | Representative(s) | KATZAROV S.A. Geneva Business Center 12 Avenue des Morgines 1213 Petit-Lancy / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | KATZAROV S.A. European Patent Attorneys 19, rue des Epinettes 1227 Genève / CH | ||
Former [2011/49] | Tripoz, Inès CABINET Inès Tripoz 52, rue du Colombier 69007 Lyon / FR | Application number, filing date | 10707062.5 | 28.01.2010 | [2015/41] | WO2010FR00070 | Priority number, date | FR20090050536 | 28.01.2009 Original published format: FR 0950536 | [2011/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010086530 | Date: | 05.08.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2391381 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2391381 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/40, A61K33/18, A61P11/00 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
A61K33/18 (EP,US);
A61K38/40 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K33/18, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/40, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINER SYNERGISTISCHEN KOMBINATION VON HYPOTHIOCYANIT UND/ODER HYPOHALIT-IONEN UND LACTOFERRIN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER BEHANDLUNG GEGEN ZYSTISCHE FIBROSE | [2011/49] | English: | USE OF A SYNERGISTIC COMBINATION OF HYPOTHIOCYANITE AND/OR HYPOHALITE IONS AND LACTOFERRIN FOR PREPARING A TREATMENT FOR CYSTIC FIBROSIS | [2015/40] | French: | UTILISATION D'UNE ASSOCIATION SYNERGIQUE D'IONS HYPOTHIOCYANITES ET/OU HYPOHALITES ET DE LACTOFERRINE POUR LA PRÉPARATION POUR LE TRAITEMENT DE LA MUCOVISCIDOSE | [2015/40] |
Former [2011/49] | Use of a synergistic combination of hypothiocyanite and/or hypohalite ions and lactoferrin for preparing a treatment for cystic fibrosis | ||
Former [2011/49] | Utilisation d'une association synergique d'ions hypothiocyanites et/ou hypohalites et de lactoferrine pour la préparation pour le traitement de la mucoviscidose | Entry into regional phase | 17.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/49] | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.01.2010 | AT | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | MT | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | SM | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | LU | 28.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 28.01.2010 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 28.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 07.10.2015 | |
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 07.10.2015 | |
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 07.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005113026 (MEDICAL DISCOVERIES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0015]; example 2; claims 39,41 *; | [Y]WO2007134180 (LACLEDE INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * paragraph [0085]; examples 1,2,4 *; | [AD]WO2008003688 (PERRAUDIN JEAN-PAUL [BE]) [AD] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XP] - SANDRE-BALLESTER ET AL, "A gift of Nature for the treatment of Pseudomonas aeruginosa", JOURNAL OF CYSTIC FIBROSIS, ELSEVIER LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S1569-1993(09)60116-8, vol. 8, ISSN 1569-1993, (20090601), page S29, (20090601), XP026192287 [XP] 1-14 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1569-1993(09)60116-8 | [Y] - TRAVIS SUE M ET AL, "Activity of abundant antimicrobials of the human airway", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY CELL AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (199905), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 1044-1549, pages 872 - 879, XP002534861 [Y] 1-14 * page 874; figure 1 * | by applicant | US2002172645 | WO2007134180 | WO2008003688 | - AM. J. RESPIR. CRIT. CARE MED., (2007), vol. 175, no. 9, page 967 |