EP2422176 - CAPACITIVE GAGE PRESSURE SENSOR WITH VACUUM DIELECTRIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Inc. 8200 Market Boulevard Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | For all designated states Rosemount Inc. 8200 Market Blvd. Chanhassen, Minnesota 55317 / US | ||
Former [2012/09] | For all designated states Rosemount, Inc. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRODEN, David, A. 3045 166th Lane Northwest Andover, MN 55304 / US | [2012/09] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2012/09] | Tucker, Nigel P. Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 10707182.1 | 02.03.2010 | WO2010US25857 | Priority number, date | US20090428968 | 23.04.2009 Original published format: US 428968 | [2012/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010123624 | Date: | 28.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2422176 | Date: | 29.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2422176 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01L9/00 | [2012/09] | CPC: |
G01L9/0072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KAPAZITIVER MESS-DRUCKSENSOR MIT VAKUUMDIELEKTRIKUM | [2012/09] | English: | CAPACITIVE GAGE PRESSURE SENSOR WITH VACUUM DIELECTRIC | [2012/09] | French: | CAPTEUR CAPACITIF DE PRESSION MANOMÉTRIQUE AVEC DIÉLECTRIQUE SOUS VIDE | [2012/09] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 12.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.03.2010 | AT | 15.05.2013 | BE | 15.05.2013 | CY | 15.05.2013 | CZ | 15.05.2013 | DK | 15.05.2013 | EE | 15.05.2013 | FI | 15.05.2013 | HR | 15.05.2013 | IT | 15.05.2013 | LT | 15.05.2013 | LV | 15.05.2013 | MC | 15.05.2013 | MK | 15.05.2013 | MT | 15.05.2013 | NL | 15.05.2013 | PL | 15.05.2013 | RO | 15.05.2013 | SE | 15.05.2013 | SI | 15.05.2013 | SK | 15.05.2013 | SM | 15.05.2013 | TR | 15.05.2013 | BG | 15.08.2013 | NO | 15.08.2013 | GR | 16.08.2013 | ES | 26.08.2013 | IS | 15.09.2013 | PT | 16.09.2013 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.03.2010 | |
AT | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
TR | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.03.2010 | |
AT | 15.05.2013 | ||
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CY | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MC | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
SM | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
MT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
NL | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
IT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
RO | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
SK | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
DK | 15.05.2013 | ||
EE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
BE | 15.05.2013 | ||
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
LV | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
HR | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
PL | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
BG | 15.08.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
FI | 15.05.2013 | ||
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
SE | 15.05.2013 | ||
SI | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
GR | 16.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.05.2013 | |
LT | 15.05.2013 | ||
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
ES | 26.08.2013 | ||
IS | 15.09.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 15.05.2013 | |
NO | 15.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB2005839 (BUNKER RAMO) [X] 1,8,14 * figure 1 *[I] 2-7,9-13,15-20 | Examination | DE10223588 | by applicant | GB2005839 |