EP2414766 - A MOBILE MISSILE LAUNCH SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Director General, Defence Research & Development Organisation Ministry of Defense, Govt of India Directorate of ER & IPR Group Room 348 "B" Wing DRDO Bhavan Rajaji Marg 110 011-New Delhi / IN | [2012/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GURUPRASAD, Siddalingappa PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411015 / IN | 02 /
KATTI, Shreedhar, Aravind PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 03 /
GOUD, Alasani Prasad PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 04 /
WAGHMARE, Vikas, Narayan PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 05 /
KUMAR, Sanjay PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 06 /
GUPTA, Atul PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 07 /
KHIRE, Ravindra, Sudhakar PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 08 /
SANTOSH, Tushar, Kant PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 09 /
GAUTAM, Bimal PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | 10 /
RAM, Paras PJ-10 R&DE (Engrs) Alandi Road Pune Maharashtra 411 015 / IN | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/06] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10707675.4 | 11.01.2010 | WO2010IN00018 | Priority number, date | IN2009DEL0648 | 30.03.2009 Original published format: IN DE06482009 | IN2009DEL0684 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: IN DE06842009 | IN2009DEL0685 | 31.03.2009 Original published format: IN DE06852009 | IN2009DEL0703 | 06.04.2009 Original published format: IN DE07032009 | [2012/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010113171 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414766 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2414766 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F41A23/34, F41A23/36, F41A23/42, F41F3/04, F41F3/052, F42B39/22 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
F41A23/42 (EP,US);
F41A23/34 (EP,US);
F41A23/36 (EP,US);
F41F3/04 (EP,US);
F41F3/052 (EP,US);
F42B39/22 (EP,US);
F41F3/042 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RAKETENSTARTSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/06] | English: | A MOBILE MISSILE LAUNCH SYSTEM AND METHOD THEREOF | [2012/06] | French: | SYSTÈME DE LANCEMENT DE MISSILE MOBILE ET PROCÉDÉ ASSOCIÉ | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 04.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2010 | AT | 09.10.2013 | BE | 09.10.2013 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | HR | 09.10.2013 | IT | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | MK | 09.10.2013 | MT | 09.10.2013 | NL | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | SM | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | NO | 09.01.2014 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IE | 11.01.2014 | LU | 11.01.2014 | FR | 31.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 11.01.2010 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
TR | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 11.01.2010 | |
AT | 09.10.2013 | ||
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
SM | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IE | 11.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
FR | 31.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
IT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 09.10.2013 | |
BE | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
HR | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
NL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
NO | 09.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3779128 (PELAEZ P) [X] 7 * column 4, line 16 - line 24; figure - * [A] 14; | [I]US3924511 (KENDALL GILES A, et al) [I] 14-16 * abstract * * column 4, line 21 - line 63 * * figure - *; | [AD]US3981224 (BYARS CHESTER W, et al) [AD] 1,17 * the whole document *; | [I]GB2096287 (BRITISH AEROSPACE) [I] 14-16 * abstract * * page 1, line 99 - page 2, line 19 * * figure - *; | [A]FR2531200 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 7,14 * page 2, line 6 - page 3, line 11 * * figure - *; | [I]JPH09210595 (JAPAN STEEL WORKS LTD) [I] 14-16* abstract *; | [A]DE19713192 (RHEINMETALL IND AG [DE]) [A] 1,17 * abstract *; | [A]WO9917989 (LOCKHEED CORP [US]) [A] 1,17 * abstract *; | [A]US2006086241 (MILLER STEPHEN W [US], et al) [A] 1,17 * abstract *; | [A]EP1710530 (MBDA ITALIA SPA [IT]) [A] 1,17 * abstract * * figure 29 *; | [A]EP1739382 (RAFAEL ARMAMENT DEV AUTHORITY [IL]) [A] 1,17 * abstract * | by applicant | US3981224 | US5094140 | US5461961 | US6584881 | US6742433 |