EP2400858 - PROTEIN PREPARATION PRODUCED FROM RAPE SEEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.09.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/01] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PICKARDT, Claudia Ringstrasse 7 12203 Berlin / DE | 02 /
EISNER, Peter Prälat-Michael-Höck-Str. 57 85354 Freising / DE | 03 /
BADER, Stephanie Alte Poststrasse 48 85356 Freising / DE | 04 /
MÜLLER, Klaus Finkenstrasse 42 85354 Freising / DE | 05 /
ZIMMERMANN, Hubert Bahnhofstrasse 32 CH-8932 Mettmenstetten / CH | 06 /
BERNATH, Etienne Alte Landstrasse 109 CH-8803 Rüschlikon / CH | 07 /
WILD, Florian Heilig-Geist-Str. 6 85354 Freising / DE | 08 /
FRANKL, Michael Veldenerstrasse 76 81241 München / DE | 09 /
GRUPPE, Sigrid Forellenweg 9a 85391 Allershausen / DE | 10 /
SCHREIBER, Klaus St.-Erhard-Strasse 19 85354 Freising / DE | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | [2021/14] |
Former [2012/01] | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG BERN Schwarztorstrasse 31 3001 Bern / CH | Application number, filing date | 10707796.8 | 26.02.2010 | [2021/14] | WO2010CH00047 | Priority number, date | DE20091010813 | 27.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009010813 | [2012/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010096943 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2400858 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2400858 | Date: | 07.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/14, A61K8/64, A61Q19/00, A23K10/30, A23K20/147, A23K50/80, A23L33/185 | [2020/42] | CPC: |
A23L33/185 (EP,US);
A23J1/142 (EP,US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A23K20/147 (EP,US);
A23K50/80 (EP,US);
A61K8/645 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/01] | A23J1/14, A23K1/16, A23L1/305, A61K8/64, A23K1/14, A23K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUS RAPSSAMEN HERGESTELLTES PROTEINPRÄPARAT | [2012/01] | English: | PROTEIN PREPARATION PRODUCED FROM RAPE SEEDS | [2012/01] | French: | PRÉPARATION PROTÉIQUE À BASE DE GRAINES DE COLZA | [2012/01] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 28.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.09.2020 | 08.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 22.09.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 27.01.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 16.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.02.2010 | CY | 07.04.2021 | CZ | 07.04.2021 | DK | 07.04.2021 | EE | 07.04.2021 | ES | 07.04.2021 | HR | 07.04.2021 | LT | 07.04.2021 | LV | 07.04.2021 | MC | 07.04.2021 | MK | 07.04.2021 | MT | 07.04.2021 | NL | 07.04.2021 | RO | 07.04.2021 | SE | 07.04.2021 | SI | 07.04.2021 | SK | 07.04.2021 | SM | 07.04.2021 | BG | 07.07.2021 | NO | 07.07.2021 | GR | 08.07.2021 | IS | 07.08.2021 | PT | 09.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/22] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
MK | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
CY | 07.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 26.02.2010 | |
CZ | 07.04.2021 | ||
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
MC | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SI | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
EE | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
RO | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SK | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 07.04.2021 | |
DK | 07.04.2021 | ||
ES | 07.04.2021 | ||
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | ES | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
SM | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | ES | 07.04.2021 | |
HR | 07.04.2021 | ||
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
IS | 07.08.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | HR | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
PT | 09.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | HR | 07.04.2021 | |
LT | 07.04.2021 | ||
LV | 07.04.2021 | ||
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
SE | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
NO | 07.07.2021 | ||
GR | 08.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | LT | 07.04.2021 | |
NL | 07.04.2021 | ||
BG | 07.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | LT | 07.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [XI]DE2421270 (ALFA LAVAL AB [SE], et al) [X] 1-15,17,18,20,22-27 * page 9, paragraph 3 - page 12, paragraph 1; figures 1,3; examples 1,8; claims 1,3,5,11,12,21,23; table 4 * * page 39 * [I] 16,21; | [XI]US4158656 (JONES JOHN D, et al) [X] 1-15,17,19-27 * column 2, line 29 - column 5; examples 1-5; claims 1-10 * [I] 16,18; | [A]US4219469 (KADAN RANJIT S [US], et al) [A] 1-27 * column 5, lines 43-50; example -; claim -; table II *; | [XI]US4244973 (VAN MEGEN WILHELMUS H) [X] 1-12,27 * columns 1-3; examples 2-4; claim 2 * [I] 13-26; | [XYI]DE19912037 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1-15 * columns 3-7; claims 1-16,30,34-36,38 * [Y] 19 [I] 20-27; | [XYI]WO2004000032 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA], et al) [X] 27 * paragraphs [0018] , [0021] , [0022]; examples ,12; table XXIX * [Y] 19 [I] 1-18,20-26; | [XI]WO2007033481 (BURCON NUTRASCIENCE MB CORP [CA], et al) [X] 27 * paragraphs [0013] , [0019] , [0033]; examples 3-8 * [I] 1-12; | [XI]US2007178566 (SCHWEIZER MARTIN [CA], et al) [X] 13-15,17,20-27 * paragraphs [0108] - [0110]; examples 1-3,5-7; tables VII,VIII,XII * [I] 1-12,16,18; | [A]UA25695U (ROHUTSKYI MYKOLA BOHDANOVYCH [UA]) [A] 1-26* abstract *; | [XPY]WO2009137934 (BIO EXTRACTION INC [CA], et al) [XP] 1-18,20-27 * pages 2-7; figures 1-7; examples 2-4,5a,7; tables 8,13,18-23,28-30,35-37,43-46 * * page 35, lines 7-23 * * page 39, line 13 - page 40, line 22 * * pages 41-47 * [Y] 19 | Examination | - Jens-Peter Dr. Krause ET AL, "Rapsprotein in der Humanernährung", UFOP-Schriften, Heft 32, Berlin, (20070101), pages 1 - 105, URL: https://www.ufop.de/files/4813/3922/6280/UFOP_Schriften_Heft_32.pdf, (20181121), XP055525677 | by applicant | EP1513415 | - YUMIKO YOSHIE-STARK ET AL., "Functional and bioactive properties of rapeseed protein concentrates and sensory analysis of food application with rapeseed protein concentrates", LWT, (2006), vol. 39, pages 503 - 512 | - KOZLOWSKA ET AL., "The influence of selected technological processes on the improvement of rapeseed meal and fluor feed quality. Part 1.", DIE NAHRUNG, (1991), vol. 35, no. 5, pages 485 - 489 | - FELIX H. SCHNEIDER; MICHAEL RASS, "Trennpressen geschälter Rapssaat - Zielsetzung und verfahrenstechnische Probleme", FETT/LIPID, (1997), vol. 99, no. 3, pages 91 - 98 | - MORR C.V.; GERMAN, B.; KINSELLA, J.E.; REGENSTEIN, J.M.; VAN BUREN, J.P.; KILARA, A.; LEWIS, B.A.; MANGINO, M.E, "A Collaborative Study to Develop a Standardized Food Protein Solubility Procedure", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 50, doi:doi:10.1111/j.1365-2621.1985.tb10572.x, pages 1715 - 1718, XP055170902 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.1985.tb10572.x | - LUDWIG I.; LUDWIG, E.; PINGEL B., "Eine Mikromethode zur Bestimmung der Fettbindkapazität", NAHRUNG/FOOD, (1989), vol. 33, no. 1, page 99 | - WÄSCHE, A.; MÜLLER, K.; KNAUF, U., "New processing of lupin protein isolates and functional properties", NAHRUNG/FOOD, (2001), vol. 45, doi:doi:10.1002/1521-3803(20011001)45:6<393::AID-FOOD393>3.0.CO;2-O, pages 393 - 395, XP009033277 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3803(20011001)45:6<393::AID-FOOD393>3.0.CO;2-O | - SOUSA, I.M.N.; MITCHELL, J.R.; LEDWARD, D. A.; HILL, S.E.; BEIRFIO DA COSTA, M.L., "Differential Scanning Calorimetry of lupin and soy proteins", ZEITSCHRIFT FÜR LEBENSMITTELUNTERSUCHUNG UND -FORSCHUNG, (1995), vol. 201, pages 566 - 569 |