EP2401514 - PROPORTIONAL CONTROL VALVE FOR PNEUMATIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoerbiger Automatisierungstechnik Holding GmbH Südliche Römerstrasse 15 86972 Altenstadt / DE | [2012/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHROBENHAUSER, Max Calvistrasse 7 86971 Peiting / DE | 02 /
SCHAIBLE, Jochen Rosenstrasse 20 72213 Altensteig / DE | 03 /
RAUSCH, Günther Straußweg 14 73630 Remshalden / DE | [2012/01] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 2b 82319 Starnberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/01] | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 10708109.3 | 25.02.2010 | WO2010EP01154 | Priority number, date | DE20091010339 | 25.02.2009 Original published format: DE102009010339 | [2012/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010097215 | Date: | 02.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2401514 | Date: | 04.01.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2401514 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F15B13/044 | [2012/01] | CPC: |
F15B13/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROPORTIONALREGELVENTIL FÜR PNEUMATISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2012/01] | English: | PROPORTIONAL CONTROL VALVE FOR PNEUMATIC APPLICATIONS | [2012/01] | French: | SOUPAPE A REGULATION PROPORTIONNELLE POUR UTILISATIONS PNEUMATIQUES | [2013/01] |
Former [2012/01] | SOUPAPE À RÉGULATION PROPORTIONNELLE POUR UTILISATIONS PNEUMATIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/01] | 25.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2010 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | HR | 09.01.2013 | IT | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | MK | 09.01.2013 | MT | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PL | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | SM | 09.01.2013 | TR | 09.01.2013 | IE | 25.02.2013 | LU | 25.02.2013 | BE | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | NO | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | PT | 09.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
TR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
SM | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
MT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 25.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
IT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 09.01.2013 | |
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
HR | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
PT | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
PL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
NO | 09.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19534017 (SAMSON AG [DE]) [AD] 1,3,4,8,9,11 * column 2, line 58 - column 4, line 55; figures 1,2 *; | [AD]DE3717260 (REXROTH MANNESMANN GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2,5,6,8-11,13 * column 1, line 32 - column 2, line 49; figure . *; | [A]DE19632691 (JOUCOMATIC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 1, lines 29-45 * * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 49 * * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 64 * * column 7, lines 18-20; figures 1,3,4; claim 17 * | by applicant | DE19534017 | DE3717260 |