EP2408719 - COMPOSITIONS FOR THE CONDITIONING OF MUD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states S.A. LHOIST RECHERCHE ET DEVELOPPEMENT Rue Charles Dubois, 28 1342 Ottignies-Louvain-la-Neuve / BE | For all designated states SNF SAS ZAC de Milieux 42160 Andrezieux-Boutheon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | For all designated states S.A. LHOIST RECHERCHE ET DEVELOPPEMENT Rue Charles Dubois, 28 1342 Ottignies-Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | ||
For all designated states SNF SAS ZAC de Milieux 42160 Andrezieux-Boutheon / FR | |||
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states S.A. LHOIST RECHERCHE ET DEVELOPPEMENT Rue Charles Dubois, 28 1342 Ottignies-Louvain-La-Neuve / BE | ||
For all designated states SNF SAS 20, rue de l'Innovation 42000 Saint-Etienne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIOTTEAU, Laurent 3, Rue du Planil 42320 Saint Christo en Jarez / FR | 02 /
BLANDIN, Gaétan 15, Rue de la Vendée 49360 Maulevrier / FR | 03 /
CHARBONNIER, Hubert 16, Chemin des Fournières 49390 Vourles / FR | 04 /
OZTURK, Tamer Rue Camille Lemonnier 17 B-7100 La Louvière / BE | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/04] | 01 /
BIOTTEAU, Laurent Rue du Planil 3 F-42320 Saint Christo en Jarez / FR | ||
02 /
BLANDIN, Gaétan Rue de la Vendée 15 F-49360 Maulevrier / FR | |||
03 /
CHARBONNIER, Hubert Chemin des Fournières 16 F-49390 Vourles / FR | |||
04 /
OZTURK, Tamer Rue Camille Lemonnier 17 B-7100 La Louvière / BE | Representative(s) | Coulon, Ludivine, et al Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2015/36] |
Former [2012/04] | Coulon, Ludivine, et al GEVERS PATENTS Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat, 5 1831 Diegem - Brussels / BE | Application number, filing date | 10709018.5 | 17.03.2010 | [2015/36] | WO2010EP53487 | Priority number, date | BE20090000161 | 17.03.2009 Original published format: BE 200900161 | [2012/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010106118 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408719 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2408719 | Date: | 02.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C02F1/52, C02F1/56, C02F1/68, C02F11/14, C08J3/05 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
C02F1/5245 (EP,US);
C02F1/5236 (EP,US);
C02F1/56 (EP,US);
C02F11/148 (EP,US);
C08J3/05 (EP,US);
C08K3/20 (EP,US);
C02F1/001 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR KONDITIONIERUNG VON SCHLAMM | [2012/04] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR THE CONDITIONING OF MUD | [2012/04] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LE CONDITIONNEMENT DE BOUES | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 13.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2010 | AT | 02.09.2015 | BG | 02.09.2015 | CY | 02.09.2015 | DK | 02.09.2015 | EE | 02.09.2015 | FI | 02.09.2015 | HR | 02.09.2015 | LT | 02.09.2015 | LV | 02.09.2015 | MC | 02.09.2015 | MK | 02.09.2015 | MT | 02.09.2015 | PL | 02.09.2015 | RO | 02.09.2015 | SI | 02.09.2015 | SK | 02.09.2015 | SM | 02.09.2015 | TR | 02.09.2015 | NO | 02.12.2015 | GR | 03.12.2015 | IS | 02.01.2016 | IE | 17.03.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 17.03.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
TR | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
IE | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 17.03.2010 | |
AT | 02.09.2015 | ||
CY | 02.09.2015 | ||
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MK | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
SM | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
IE | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
MT | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
IE | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
IE | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
MC | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
DK | 02.09.2015 | ||
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SI | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
RO | 02.09.2015 | ||
SK | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
EE | 02.09.2015 | ||
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
IS | 02.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 02.09.2015 | |
FI | 02.09.2015 | ||
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
HR | 02.09.2015 | ||
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
PL | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 02.09.2015 | |
LT | 02.09.2015 | ||
LV | 02.09.2015 | ||
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
GR | 03.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 02.09.2015 | |
NO | 02.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 02.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO0047527 (LHOIST RECH & DEV SA [BE], et al) [X] 1,4-14 * page 8, line 17 - page 10, line 28; example -; claim - * [Y] 2,3; | [XY]US4675114 (ZAGYVAI ISTVAN [HU], et al) [X] 1,5,6,8-14 * column 3, line 27 - column 5, line 17; claim - * [Y] 2-4,7; | [XY]US4711727 (MATTHEWS KENNETH B [GB], et al) [X] 1,4-8,10-14 * column 2, lines 44-51 * * column 3, line 44 - column 5, line 2 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 35; example -; claim - * [Y] 2,3; | [Y]US5128046 (MARBLE ROBERT A [US], et al) [Y] 1-6,10-12 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6042732 (JANKOWSKI JEFFREY A [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * claim - *; | [Y]US4010135 (TUTEIN THOMAS R) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB1159819 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]GB842910 (ROHM & HAAS) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0104904 | US4711727 | US4675114 | EP1154958 | WO2008058973 | - DEGRéMONT, Mémento Technique de l'eau, (70519) |