EP2408967 - A METHOD OF ROLLING RAILS, APPARATUS FOR ROLLING RAILS AND RAIL PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tata Steel UK Ltd 30 Millbank London SW1P 4WY / GB | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIPTON, Damian, Gerard 29 Axholme Road Scunthorpe North Lincolnshire DN15 7HL / GB | 02 /
GARNER, Keith 126 Ferry Road West Scunthorpe North Lincorlnshire DN15 8UQ / GB | 03 /
WRIGHT, Simon, Justin 26 Church Street Hemswell Lincolnshire DN21 5UQ / GB | [2012/04] | Representative(s) | Bodin, Andre Tata Steel Nederland Technology B.V. Group Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 10000 - 3G.37 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Bodin, Andre Tata Steel Nederland Technology BV Group Intellectual Property Services - 3H.18 PO Box 10000 1970 CA IJmuiden / NL | Application number, filing date | 10709165.4 | 08.03.2010 | WO2010EP01426 | Priority number, date | EP20090003746 | 16.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09003746 | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010105749 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2408967 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | E01B31/13, B21B1/085 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
E01B31/13 (EP);
B21B1/085 (EP);
B21B13/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Extension states | AL | 17.10.2011 | BA | 17.10.2011 | ME | 17.10.2011 | RS | 17.10.2011 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM WALZEN VON SCHIENEN, VORRICHTUNG ZUM WALZEN VON SCHIENEN UND GEMÄSS DEM VERFAHREN HERGESTELLTE SCHIENE | [2012/04] | English: | A METHOD OF ROLLING RAILS, APPARATUS FOR ROLLING RAILS AND RAIL PRODUCED ACCORDING TO SAID METHOD | [2012/04] | French: | PRODUCTION DE RAILS ROULANTS, APPAREIL POUR RAILS ROULANTS ET RAIL PRODUIT SELON CE PROCÉDÉ | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 01.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2068282 (SACILOR) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 4, line 51 - page 5, line 44; figures 1-16; claim 1 *; | [A]US4393680 (KOVACS DANIEL C) [A] 1,2,4,7 * figures 1-8; claims 1,7 *; | [A]US4400962 (MICHAUX JACQUES M [FR]) [A] 1,2,7* figures 3-7; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2004009259 (DANIELI OFF MECC [IT], et al) [A] 1,2,7 * figures 1-6; claim 1 * |