EP2411533 - Genetic severity markers in multiple sclerosis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/05] | GENETIC SEVERITY MARKERS IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | ||
[2015/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): MT | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Serono S.A. Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins / CH | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABDERRAHIM, Hadi 170 avenue des Thermes F-01220 Divonne les Bains / FR | 02 /
WOJCIK, Jérôme 218 Rue Combe de l'Eau F-01220 Divonne Les Bains / FR | 03 /
ESPOSITO, Federica 4 Via Bergamo I-24039 Sotto II Monte Giovanni XXIII (BG) / IT | 04 /
DEBAILLEUL, Virginie 555 Rue de Paruthiol F-01630 Peron / FR | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | [2016/12] |
Former [2012/05] | Merck Serono SA - Geneva Intellectual Property 9, chemin des Mines 1202 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 10709859.2 | 25.03.2010 | [2016/12] | WO2010EP53871 | Priority number, date | EP20090156487 | 27.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09156487 | US20090165141P | 31.03.2009 Original published format: US 165141 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010127906 | Date: | 11.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411533 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411533 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
C12Q2531/113 (KR);
C12Q2600/112 (KR);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q2600/172 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | 27.09.2011 | BA | 27.09.2011 | ME | 27.09.2011 | RS | 27.09.2011 | Title | German: | Genetische Marker für die Schwere von multipler Sklerose | [2015/43] | English: | Genetic severity markers in multiple sclerosis | [2015/45] | French: | Marqueurs génétiques de gravité de la sclérose en plaques | [2015/43] |
Former [2012/05] | GENETISCHE SCHWERE-MARKER BEI MULTIPLER SKLEROSE | ||
Former [2012/05] | GENETIC SEVERITY MARKERS IN MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS | ||
Former [2012/05] | MARQUEURS GÉNÉTIQUES DE GRAVITÉ DANS LA SCLÉROSE EN PLAQUES | Entry into regional phase | 27.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 09.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2010 | AT | 23.03.2016 | BE | 23.03.2016 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | DK | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | HR | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | MK | 23.03.2016 | NL | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SE | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | SM | 23.03.2016 | TR | 23.03.2016 | IE | 25.03.2016 | LU | 25.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | NO | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/31] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 25.03.2010 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
TR | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2016 | ||
LU | 25.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 25.03.2010 | |
AT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
MK | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MT | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
DK | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 25.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
BE | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 23.03.2016 | |
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
SM | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
NL | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
SE | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
HR | 23.03.2016 | ||
NO | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2006076641 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,14,15 * page 9, paragraph l * * page 2, paragraph 4; figure 9; claims 7-8,11-12 * * page 85, lines 1-2; table 1 * * page 54, paragraph 2 * [Y] 3,6-15 [I] 7,13; | [A] - VAN VEEN ET AL, "CCL5 and CCR5 genotypes modify clinical, radiological and pathological features of multiple sclerosis", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, XX, (20071001), vol. 190, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 157 - 164, XP022350631 [A] 1-15 * page 158, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneuroim.2007.08.005 | [A] - FUKAZAWA TOSHIYUKI ET AL, "CTLA-4 gene polymorphism may modulate disease in Japanese multiple sclerosis patients", JOURNAL OF THE NEUROLOGICAL SCIENCES, (19991201), vol. 171, no. 1, ISSN 0022-510X, pages 49 - 55, XP002567285 [A] 1-15 * page 52, column l; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-510X(99)00251-8 | [A] - MANN C L A ET AL, "Interleukin 1 genotypes in multiple sclerosis and relationship to disease severity", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, (200208), vol. 129, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, pages 197 - 204, XP002567286 [A] 1-15 * page 199, column r, paragraph 2 * * page 201, column r, paragraph l - page 202, column l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-5728(02)00181-9 | [XY] - AMBROSIUS MICHAEL ET AL, "The xylosyltransferase Iota gene polymorphism c.343G>T (p.A115S) is associated with decreased serum glycosaminoglycan levels.", CLINICAL BIOCHEMISTRY JAN 2009, (200901), vol. 42, no. 1-2, ISSN 1873-2933, pages 1 - 4, XP002567288 [X] 1,2,4,5 * page 2, column r - page 3, column r * [Y] 3,6-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/J.CLINBIOCHEM.2008.10.013 | [A] - LEE SUNG-UK ET AL, "N-glycan processing deficiency promotes spontaneous inflammatory demyelination and neurodegeneration.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 16 NOV 2007, (20071116), vol. 282, no. 46, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 33725 - 33734, XP002567287 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M704839200 | [T] - BRYNEDAL B ET AL, "MGAT5 alters the severity of multiple sclerosis", JOURNAL OF NEUROIMMUNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, XX LNKD- DOI:10.1016/J.JNEUROIM.2010.01.003, vol. 220, no. 1-2, ISSN 0165-5728, (20100330), pages 120 - 124, (20100201), XP026939091 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jneuroim.2010.01.003 | by applicant | - KURZKE J.F., NEUROEPIDEMIOLOGY, (1991), vol. 10, pages 1 - 8 | - KURZKE J.F., NEUROLOGY, (1983), vol. 33, pages 1444 - 1452 | - MCDONALD W.I ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (2001), vol. 50, pages 121 - 127 | - POLMAN C.H. ET AL., ANN. NEUROL., (2005), vol. 58, pages 840 - 846 | - DYMENT DA; EBERS GC; SADOVNICK AD, "Genetics of multiple sclerosis", LANCET NEUROL., (2004), vol. 3, pages 104 - 110 | - HAFLER DA; COMPSTON A; SAWCER S ET AL., "Risk alleles for multiple sclerosis identified by a genomewide study", N ENGL J MED., (2007), page 357 | - LINCOLN MR; MONTPETIT A; CADER MZ ET AL., "A predominant role for the HLA class II region in the association of the MHC region with multiple sclerosis", NAT GENET., (2005), vol. 37, pages 1108 - 1112 | - COMPSTON A; SAWCER S, "Genetic analysis of multiple sclerosis", CURR NEUROL NEUROSCI REP., (2002), vol. 2, pages 259 - 266 | - FOGDELL-HAHN A; LIGERS A; GRONNING M ET AL., "Multiple sclerosis: a modifying influence of HLA class I genes in an HLA class II associated autoimmune disease", TISSUE ANTIGENS, (2000), vol. 55, pages 140 - 148 | - HARBO HF; LIE BA; SAWCER S ET AL., "Genes in the HLA class I region may contribute to the HLA class II-associated genetic susceptibility to multiple sclerosis", TISSUE ANTIGENS, (2004), vol. 63, pages 237 - 247 | - YEO TW; DE JAGER PL; GREGORY SG ET AL., "A second major histocompatibility complex susceptibility locus for multiple sclerosis", ANN NEUROL., (2007), vol. 61, pages 228 - 236 | - ZHANG Z; DUVEFELT K; SVENSSON F ET AL., "Two genes encoding immune-regulatory molecules (LAG3 and IL7R) confer susceptibility to multiple sclerosis", GENES IMMUN., (2005), vol. 6, pages 145 - 152 | - LUNDMARK F; DUVEFELT K; HILLERT J, "Genetic association analysis of the interleukin 7 gene (IL7) in multiple sclerosis", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 192, pages 171 - 173 | - HENSIEK AE; SEAMAN SR; BARCELLOS LF ET AL., "Familial effects on the clinical course of multiple sclerosis", NEUROLOGY, (2007), vol. 68, pages 376 - 383 | - RASMUSSEN HB; CLAUSEN J, "Genetic risk factors in multiple sclerosis and approaches to their identification", J NEUROVIROL., (2000), vol. 6, no. 2, pages S23 - S27 | - KURTZKE JF, "Rating neurologic impairment in multiple sclerosis: an expanded disability status scale (EDSS)", NEUROLOGY, (1983), vol. 33, pages 1444 - 1452 | - ROXBURGH RH; SEAMAN SR; MASTERMAN T ET AL., "Multiple Sclerosis Severity Score: using disability and disease duration to rate disease severity", NEUROLOGY, (2005), vol. 64, pages 1144 - 1151 | - KANTARCI OH; DE AM; WEINSHENKER BG, "Identifying disease modifying genes in multiple sclerosis", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 123, pages 144 - 159 | - BURWICK RM; RAMSAY PP; HAINES JL ET AL., "APOE epsilon variation in multiple sclerosis susceptibility and disease severity: some answers", NEUROLOGY, (2006), vol. 66, pages 1373 - 1383 | - SANTOS M; DO CARMO CM; EDITE RM ET AL., "Genotypes at the APOE and SCA2 loci do not predict the course of multiple sclerosis in patients of Portuguese origin", MULT SCLER., (2004), vol. 10, pages 153 - 157 | - LINDQUIST S; SCHOTT BH; BAN M ET AL., "The BDNF-Val66Met polymorphism: implications for susceptibility to multiple sclerosis and severity of disease", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 167, pages 183 - 185 | - KRONER A; VOGEL F; KOLB-MAURER A ET AL., "Impact of the Asp299Gly polymorphism in the toll-like receptor 4 (tlr-4) gene on disease course of multiple sclerosis", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 165, pages 161 - 165 | - HENSIEK AE; ROXBURGH R; MERANIAN M ET AL., "Osteopontin gene and clinical severity of multiple sclerosis", J NEUROL., (2003), vol. 250, pages 943 - 947 | - VAN VT; CRUSIUS JB; VAN WL ET AL., "CTLA-4 and CD28 gene polymorphisms in susceptibility, clinical course and progression of multiple sclerosis", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 140, pages 188 - 193 | - SCHREIBER K; OTURA AB; RYDER LP ET AL., "Disease severity in Danish multiple sclerosis patients evaluated by MRI and three genetic markers (HLA-DRB1 *1501, CCR5 deletion mutation, apolipoprotein E)", MULT SCLER., (2002), vol. 8, pages 295 - 298 | - MANN CL; DAVIES MB; STEVENSON VL ET AL., "Interleukin 1 genotypes in multiple sclerosis and relationship to disease severity", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 129, pages 197 - 204 | - ALMERAS L; MERESSE B; SEZE J ET AL., "Interleukin-10 promoter polymorphism in multiple sclerosis: association with disease progression", EUR CYTOKINE NETW, (2002), vol. 13, pages 200 - 206 | - GOERTSCHES R; COMABELLA M; NAVARRO A ET AL., "Genetic association between polymorphisms in the ADAMTS14 gene and multiple sclerosis", J NEUROIMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 164, pages 140 - 147 | - MEAD RJ; NEAL JW; GRIFFITHS MR ET AL., "Deficiency of the complement regulator CD59a enhances disease severity, demyelination and axonal injury in murine acute experimental allergic encephalomyelitis", LAB INVEST., (2004), vol. 84, pages 21 - 28 | - MCDONALD WI; COMPSTON A; EDAN G ET AL., "Recommended diagnostic criteria for multiple sclerosis: guidelines from the International Panel on the diagnosis of multiple sclerosis", ANN NEUROL., (2001), vol. 50, pages 121 - 127 | - LUBLIN FD; REINGOLD SC, "Defining the clinical course of multiple sclerosis: results of an international survey. National Multiple Sclerosis Society (USA) Advisory Committee on Clinical Trials of New Agents in Multiple Sclerosis", NEUROLOGY, (1996), vol. 46, pages 907 - 911 | - WILCOXON F, "Individual comparisons by ranking methods", BIOMETRICS, (1945), vol. 1, pages 80 - 83 | - STOREY JD; TIBSHIRANI R, "Statistical significance for genomewide studies", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (2003), vol. 100, pages 9440 - 9445 | - BIRNEY E. ENSEMBL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (2007), vol. 35, pages 610 - 617 | - BARRETT JC; FRY B; MALLER J ET AL., "Haploview: analysis and visualization of LD and haplotype maps", BIOINFORMATICS, (2005), vol. 21, pages 263 - 265 | - GRANOVSKY M; FATA J; PAWLING J ET AL., "Suppression of tumor growth and metastasis in Mgat5-deficient mice", NAT MED., (2000), vol. 6, pages 306 - 312 | - DEMETRIOU M; GRANOVSKY M; QUAGGIN S ET AL., "Negative regulation of T-cell activation and autoimmunity by Mgat5 N-glycosylation", NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 733 - 739 | - MORGAN R; GAO G; PAWLING J ET AL., "N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase V (Mgat5)-mediated N-glycosylation negatively regulates Th1 cytokine production by T cells", J IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 173, pages 7200 - 7208 | - ORLACCHIO A; SARCHIELLI P; GALLAI V ET AL., "Activity levels of a beta1,6 N-acetylglucosaminyltransferase in lymphomonocytes from multiple sclerosis patients", J NEUROL SCI., (1997), vol. 151, pages 177 - 183 | - CARULLI D; LAABS T; GELLER HM ET AL., "Chondroitin sulfate proteoglycans in neural development and regeneration", CURR OPIN NEUROBIOL., (2005), vol. 15, pages 116 - 120 | - VAN HJ; BO L; DIJKSTRA CD ET AL., "Extensive extracellular matrix depositions in active multiple sclerosis lesions", NEUROBIOL DIS., (2006), vol. 24, pages 484 - 491 | - GRIMPE B; SILVER J, "A novel DNA enzyme reduces glycosaminoglycan chains in the glial scar and allows microtransplanted dorsal root ganglia axons to regenerate beyond lesions in the spinal cord", J NEUROSCI., (2004), vol. 24, pages 1393 - 1397 | - GRIMPE B; PRESSMAN Y; LUPA MD ET AL., "The role of proteoglycans in Schwann cell/astrocyte interactions and in regeneration failure at PNS/CNS interfaces", MOL CELL NEUROSCI., (2005), vol. 28, pages 18 - 29 | - GOTTING C; SOLLBERG S; KUHN J ET AL., "Serum xylosyltransferase: a new biochemical marker of the sclerotic process in systemic sclerosis", J INVEST DERMATOL., (1999), vol. 112, pages 919 - 924 | - GARCIA GG; BERGER SB; SADIGHI AKHA AA ET AL., "Age-associated changes in glycosylation of CD43 and CD45 on mouse CD4 T cells", EUR J IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 35, pages 622 - 631 | - GRABIE N; DELFS MW; LIM YC ET AL., "Beta-galactoside alpha2,3-sialyltransferase-I gene expression during Th2 but not Th1 differentiation: implications for core2-glycan formation on cell surface proteins", EUR J IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 32, pages 2766 - 2772 | - DESCAMPS FJ; VAN DEN STEEN PE; NELISSEN I ET AL., "Remnant epitopes generate autoimmunity: from rheumatoid arthritis and multiple sclerosis to diabetes", ADV EXP MED BIOL., (2003), vol. 535, pages 69 - 77 | - OPDENAKKER G; DILLEN C; FITEN P ET AL., "Remnant epitopes, autoimmunity and glycosylation", BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (2006), vol. 1760, pages 610 - 615 | - DUBOIS B; MASURE S; HURTENBACH U ET AL., "Resistance of young gelatinase B-deficient mice to experimental autoimmune encephalomyelitis and necrotizing tail lesions", J CLIN INVEST., (1999), vol. 104, pages 1507 - 1515 | - ITOH T; MATSUDA H; TANIOKA M ET AL., "The role of matrix metalloproteinase-2 and matrix metalloproteinase-9 in antibody-induced arthritis", J IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 169, pages 2643 - 2647 |