EP2411467 - IMPACT RESISTANT MODIFIED POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS FOR PRODUCING METALIZED MOULDED ARTICLES WITH HOMOGENOUS SURFACE GLOSS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 10 40789 Monheim / DE | [2013/22] |
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEIDEL, Andreas Birnenweg 5 41542 Dormagen / DE | 02 /
WENZ, Eckhard Franzstrasse 24 50931 Köln / DE | 03 /
KLANKERS, Hans-Jürgen Eintrachtstrasse 102 51375 Leverkusen / DE | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Alfred-Nobel-Straße 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | BIP Patents c/o Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim / DE | ||
Former [2013/22] | BIP Patents Bayer Intellectual Property GmbH Creative Campus Monheim Alfred-Nobel-Straße 10 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10710212.1 | 16.03.2010 | WO2010EP01641 | Priority number, date | DE20091015039 | 26.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009015039 | [2012/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010108617 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411467 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411467 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L55/02, C08L69/00 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08F279/04 (KR);
C08J3/20 (KR);
C08L51/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08L55/02 (EP,KR,US);
C08L69/005 (EP,US);
C08L2207/53 (KR)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/005, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L69/00, C08L2666/24 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAGZÄHMODIFIZIERTE POLYCARBONAT-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG METALLISIERTER FORMKÖRPER MIT HOMOGENEM OBERFLÄCHENGLANZ | [2012/05] | English: | IMPACT RESISTANT MODIFIED POLYCARBONATE COMPOSITIONS FOR PRODUCING METALIZED MOULDED ARTICLES WITH HOMOGENOUS SURFACE GLOSS | [2012/05] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE POLYCARBONATE À RÉSISTANCE AUX IMPACTS MODIFIÉE POUR LA FABRICATION DE CORPS MOULÉS MÉTALLISÉS À BRILLANCE DE SURFACE HOMOGÈNE | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.04.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 22.04.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.05.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.03.2010 | CY | 14.01.2015 | CZ | 14.01.2015 | DK | 14.01.2015 | EE | 14.01.2015 | FI | 14.01.2015 | HR | 14.01.2015 | LT | 14.01.2015 | LV | 14.01.2015 | MC | 14.01.2015 | MK | 14.01.2015 | MT | 14.01.2015 | PL | 14.01.2015 | RO | 14.01.2015 | SE | 14.01.2015 | SI | 14.01.2015 | SK | 14.01.2015 | SM | 14.01.2015 | TR | 14.01.2015 | AT | 16.03.2015 | IE | 16.03.2015 | LU | 16.03.2015 | CH | 31.03.2015 | LI | 31.03.2015 | BG | 14.04.2015 | NO | 14.04.2015 | GR | 15.04.2015 | IS | 14.05.2015 | PT | 14.05.2015 | [2018/30] |
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.03.2010 | |
CY | 14.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.01.2015 | ||
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
SM | 14.01.2015 | ||
TR | 14.01.2015 | ||
AT | 16.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
PT | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
MT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
AT | 16.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
AT | 16.03.2015 | ||
IE | 16.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SI | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
IE | 16.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
IE | 16.03.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
CH | 31.03.2015 | ||
LI | 31.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 14.01.2015 | |
DK | 14.01.2015 | ||
EE | 14.01.2015 | ||
FI | 14.01.2015 | ||
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
RO | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
SK | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
LU | 16.03.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
MC | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
LV | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IS | 14.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
PL | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
GR | 15.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 14.01.2015 | |
HR | 14.01.2015 | ||
LT | 14.01.2015 | ||
SE | 14.01.2015 | ||
BG | 14.04.2015 | ||
NO | 14.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 14.01.2015 | |
NO | 14.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1397219 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-12 * examples 16,17; claim -; table II *; | [I]JP2002124109 (NIPPON A & L KK) [I] 1-15* the whole document *; | [X]US2006217496 (MIURA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * table 1 * | by applicant | US3419634 | DE2035390 | DE1495626 | US3644574 | DE2248242 | DE2232877 | GB1409275 | DE2703376 | DE2714544 | DE2842005 | DE3000610 | DE3007934 | DE3334782 | DE3631540 | DE3631539 | DE3704657 | DE3704655 | DE3832396 | US4937285 | EP0606558 | DE4404604 | EP0704488 | EP0768157 | EP0867463 | JPH10287802 | JP2002124109 | JP2005119239 | JP3880142B | - ULLMANNS, Enzyklopädie der Technischen Chemie, (1980), vol. 19, page 280 FF | - W. SCHOLTAN; H, LANGE; KOLLOID, Z, Z. POLYMERE, (1972), vol. 250, pages 782 - 1796 |