EP2408844 - CO-POLYMER BASED POLYIMIDE ARTICLES AND THEIR USES IN HIGH TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2012/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUNNINGHAM, John, P. 105 W Dorothys Way Lincoln University, Pennsylvania 19352 / US | 02 /
LOUDIN, Jeffrey, L 203 Chaingate Circle Landenburg Pennsylvania 19350 / US | [2012/10] |
Former [2012/04] | 01 /
CUNNINGHAM, John, P. 383 Indian Run Road Avondale Pennsylvania 19311 / US | ||
02 /
LOUDIN, Jeffrey, L 203 Chaingate Circle Landenburg Pennsylvania 19350 / US | Representative(s) | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Heinemann, Monica, et al Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 01 09 81628 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/04] | Heinemann, Monica Abitz & Partner Patentanwälte Hörselbergstrasse 5 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10710504.1 | 16.03.2010 | WO2010US27487 | Priority number, date | US20090160963P | 17.03.2009 Original published format: US 160963 P | [2012/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010107797 | Date: | 23.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2408844 | Date: | 25.01.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/10, C08J9/00, C08L79/08, C08K3/00, C08K3/04, B29C43/00, B29C43/02, F24C15/00, F02B37/00, C09J9/00, F02M25/00 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
B29C43/003 (EP,KR);
C08G73/1042 (EP,KR);
C08G73/1067 (EP,KR);
C08K3/013 (EP,KR);
C08K3/04 (EP,KR);
C08K3/34 (KR);
C08K7/06 (KR);
C08L27/18 (KR);
C08L79/08 (EP,KR);
F01N13/16 (EP,KR);
F02B39/00 (EP,KR);
F02M26/11 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/04] | Title | German: | GEGENSTÄNDE AUS POLYIMID AUF COPOLYMERBASIS UND IHRE VERWENDUNGEN BEI HOCHTEMPERATURANWENDUNGEN | [2012/04] | English: | CO-POLYMER BASED POLYIMIDE ARTICLES AND THEIR USES IN HIGH TEMPERATURE APPLICATIONS | [2012/04] | French: | ARTICLES EN POLYIMIDE SOUS FORME COPOLYMÈRE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS DANS DES APPLICATIONS À HAUTES TEMPÉRATURES | [2012/04] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/04] | 05.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/42] | 31.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO2008079365 (DU PONT [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * examples 1,2,12 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 7 * [Y] 1-15; | [IY]US5900197 (MATSUI AKIRA [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 6, lines 1-15, 49-53 * * column 15, lines 12-30 * [Y] 1-15; | [IY]JP2000129001 ; | [Y]US2008227907 (SCHMECKPEPER MARK R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 6, table 1, "Base resin 1" *; | [A]US2002037995 (TSUMIYAMA TATSUO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * example 1 *; | [A]GB2086470 (CHEVRON RES) [A] 1-15 * claims 1,13 * | [IY] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 33, Database accession no. 2000-382136, XP002586425 & JP2000129001 A 20000509 (UBE IND LTD) [I] 1-15 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 | by applicant | US3179614 | EP0170299 | EP0454222 | - L. BOKOBZA ET AL., POLYMER INTERNATIONAL, (2004), vol. 53, pages 1060 - 1065 | - BRUNAUER ET AL., "Adsorption of Gases in Multimolecular Layers", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1938), vol. 60, pages 309 - 19 | - MURRAY, APPLIED CLAY SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 1, no. 7, pages 207 - 221 | - MURRAY, APPLIED CLAY SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 17, pages 207 - 221 |