EP2411812 - METABOLIC PROFILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AnaMar AB Kungsportsavenyn 22 411 36 Goteborg / SE | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDSTEDT, Erik, Torbjörn Granelidsvägen 7B S-756 55 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
TRYGG, Nils, Johan Oxbärsvägen 20 S-904 35 Umea / SE | 03 /
GABRIELSSON, Jon, Robert Lingonvägen 29 S-903 39 Umea / SE | 04 /
EKSTRÖM, Gunilla Väpplingvägen 19 S-227 38 Lund / SE | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Webber, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Webber, Philip Michael Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 10710609.8 | 24.03.2010 | WO2010GB00557 | Priority number, date | GB20090005090 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0905090 | GB20090005096 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0905096 | GB20090005098 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: GB 0905098 | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010109192 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411812 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2411812 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/564, G01N33/68 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
G01N33/6812 (EP,US);
G01N33/6806 (GB);
A61P19/02 (EP);
G01N33/564 (EP,US);
G01N2800/10 (GB);
G01N2800/102 (EP,GB,US);
G01N2800/105 (GB);
G01N2800/24 (GB);
G01N2800/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STOFFWECHSELPROFILE | [2012/05] | English: | METABOLIC PROFILES | [2012/05] | French: | PROFILS MÉTABOLIQUES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 02.07.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.11.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.07.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.03.2010 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | DK | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | HR | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MK | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | NL | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SE | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | SM | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | NO | 01.01.2014 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | IE | 24.03.2014 | LU | 24.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 24.03.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
TR | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 24.03.2010 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
SM | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 01.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
IE | 24.03.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
LU | 24.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
DK | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
HR | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
NL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SE | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
NO | 02.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [IDA]WO2008035204 (BOTTAZZO GIAN FRANCO [IT], et al); | by applicant | US4946778 | WO0211715 | US2005054005 | WO2006066263 | WO2007110358 | DE102006026173 | WO2008031917 | WO2008035204 |