EP2410979 - FORMULATIONS CONTAINING SORBITAN CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 26.07.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2019/09] |
Former [2013/41] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Strasse 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Evonik Goldschmidt GmbH Goldschmidtstrasse 100 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERRWERTH, Sascha Frankenstraße 90 45134 Essen / DE | 02 /
PEGGAU, Jörg Schienenspur 18 45357 Essen / DE | 03 /
GRÜNING, Burghard Waldsaum 11 45134 Essen / DE | 04 /
KORTEMEIER, Uta Moltkestr. 4 45128 Essen / DE | 05 /
SPRINGER, Oliver Krumme Stege 23 46485 Wesel / DE | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Evonik Patent Association c/o Evonik Industries AG IP Management Bau 1042A/PB 15 Paul-Baumann-Straße 1 45772 Marl / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | (deleted) | Application number, filing date | 10711362.3 | 23.02.2010 | [2016/51] | WO2010EP52252 | Priority number, date | DE20091001748 | 23.03.2009 Original published format: DE102009001748 | [2012/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010108738 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2410979 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2410979 | Date: | 21.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61Q5/02, A61Q5/12, A61Q19/10 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
A61K8/4973 (EP,US);
A61K8/498 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/10 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FORMULIERUNGEN ENTHALTEND SORBITANCARBONSÄUREESTER | [2012/05] | English: | FORMULATIONS CONTAINING SORBITAN CARBOXYLIC ACID ESTER | [2012/05] | French: | COMPOSITIONS CONTENANT DES ESTERS D'ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE DE SORBITANE | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2011 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 26.04.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Jacobi, Markus Alexander Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.09.2017
ADMISSIBLE Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Brüningstrasse 50 65929 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Jacobi, Markus Alexander Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | 27.10.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.03.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 29.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2019 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.03.2019 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.07.2019 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2019/35] | Appeal following opposition | 24.05.2019 | Appeal received No. T1530/19 | 03.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.02.2010 | CY | 21.12.2016 | CZ | 21.12.2016 | DK | 21.12.2016 | EE | 21.12.2016 | ES | 21.12.2016 | FI | 21.12.2016 | HR | 21.12.2016 | IT | 21.12.2016 | LT | 21.12.2016 | LV | 21.12.2016 | MC | 21.12.2016 | MK | 21.12.2016 | MT | 21.12.2016 | NL | 21.12.2016 | PL | 21.12.2016 | RO | 21.12.2016 | SE | 21.12.2016 | SI | 21.12.2016 | SK | 21.12.2016 | SM | 21.12.2016 | TR | 21.12.2016 | AT | 23.02.2017 | IE | 23.02.2017 | LU | 23.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | BG | 21.03.2017 | NO | 21.03.2017 | GR | 22.03.2017 | IS | 21.04.2017 | PT | 21.04.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MK | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
AT | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
CY | 21.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
AT | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.02.2010 | |
CZ | 21.12.2016 | ||
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
AT | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
MT | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
AT | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
AT | 23.02.2017 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SI | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 23.02.2017 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 23.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
DK | 21.12.2016 | ||
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
MC | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
IT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
SM | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 21.03.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
PT | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
ES | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
PL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
SK | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
IS | 21.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 21.12.2016 | |
EE | 21.12.2016 | ||
FI | 21.12.2016 | ||
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
RO | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
NL | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 21.12.2016 | |
HR | 21.12.2016 | ||
LT | 21.12.2016 | ||
LV | 21.12.2016 | ||
SE | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
NO | 21.03.2017 | ||
GR | 22.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 21.12.2016 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE102004036067 (GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 7; examples E1-E5 * * paragraph [0035] *; | [X]JP2000239697 (EAGLE STAR KK) [X] 1-9 * example - *; | [X]JPS5156809 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-9 * example - *; | [X]AU654954B (ECOLAB INC) [X] 1-9 * table 1 *; | [X]JP2003238396 (NISSHIN PHARMA INC, et al) [X] 1-9 * examples 8-10 *; | [X]JP2008169123 (DAI ICHI KOGYO SEIYAKU CO LTD) [X] 1-10 * paragraph [0022]; examples 1-5,7-12 *; | [X]JPH0267247 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * examples 1-10 *; | [X]EP1762216 (NISSHIN OILLIO GROUP LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0012]; example 10 *; | [I]EP1813251 (GOLDSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0035] - [0036] * * example - * | [X] - FUKUSHIMA NORIKO, "Water-soluble rinses for dishwashers", CA,, (20000929), Database accession no. 133-209704, URL: CA, XP002643077 [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - MIURA TAKESHI ET AL, "Rinsing assistants", CA,, (19760518), Database accession no. 85-96134, URL: CA, XP002643079 [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - MINEMURA TAKESHI ET AL, "Coenzyme Q10-containing emulsions, and manufacture thereof", CA,, (20030827), Database accession no. 139_202492, URL: CA, XP002643081 [X] 1-9 * abstract * | [X] - MORI TOSHIKI, "Transparent cleansers comprising nonionic surfactants", CA,, (20080724), Database accession no. 149-183047, URL: CA, XP002643078 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | Opposition | DE102004036067 | JP2000239697 | JPS5156809 | AU654954B | JP2003238396 | JP2008169123 | JPH0267247 | EP1762216 | EP1813251 | EP1770082 | US3928212 | US4861513 | WO9707189 | EP1700618 | - "Band Pl-S, Stichworte ''D-Sorbit, ''Sorbitane'', ''Sorbitanester"", Jürgen Falbe et al, Römpp Chemielexikon, (19950000), pages 4216 - 4217, XP055420954 | - ""Hydroxylzahl"", Jürgen Falbe Et Al, Römpp Chemielexikon, (19950000), page 1906, XP055420958 |