EP2417631 - OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Global Technologies LLC 2040 Dow Center Midland, MI 48674 / US | [2012/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONECAMP, Jeffrey, E. 2901 Braley Court Midland MI 48640 / US | 02 /
BOVEN, Michelle, L. 5713 Stellwater Lane Midland MI 48642 / US | 03 /
GASTON, Ryan, S. 3919 East Pine Hollow Drive Midland MI 48642 / US | [2012/07] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 10711498.5 | 18.03.2010 | WO2010US27886 | Priority number, date | US20090162398P | 23.03.2009 Original published format: US 162398 P | [2012/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010111125 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2417631 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2417631 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, H01L31/0203, H01L31/048, H01L51/52 | [2012/07] | CPC: |
H01L31/048 (EP,KR,US);
H01L31/0203 (KR);
H10K50/84 (US);
H01L31/02013 (EP,US);
H02S20/23 (KR);
H10K50/841 (US);
H10K50/8426 (US);
H10K50/8428 (US);
H10K50/846 (US);
H10K59/871 (EP,KR);
H10K59/8722 (EP,KR);
H10K59/874 (EP,KR);
H10K2102/311 (EP,KR,US);
H10K50/805 (US);
H10K59/8723 (EP,KR);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHE ANORDNUNG | [2012/07] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2012/07] | French: | DISPOSITIF OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE | [2012/07] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.09.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/07] | 04.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2010 | AT | 17.07.2013 | BE | 17.07.2013 | BG | 17.07.2013 | CY | 17.07.2013 | CZ | 17.07.2013 | DK | 17.07.2013 | EE | 17.07.2013 | FI | 17.07.2013 | HR | 17.07.2013 | LT | 17.07.2013 | LV | 17.07.2013 | MC | 17.07.2013 | MK | 17.07.2013 | MT | 17.07.2013 | NL | 17.07.2013 | PL | 17.07.2013 | RO | 17.07.2013 | SE | 17.07.2013 | SI | 17.07.2013 | SK | 17.07.2013 | SM | 17.07.2013 | TR | 17.07.2013 | NO | 17.10.2013 | GR | 18.10.2013 | ES | 28.10.2013 | IS | 17.11.2013 | PT | 18.11.2013 | GB | 18.03.2014 | IE | 18.03.2014 | LU | 18.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 18.03.2010 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
TR | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.03.2010 | |
AT | 17.07.2013 | ||
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
BG | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MC | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
SM | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
MT | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
GB | 18.03.2014 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
IE | 18.03.2014 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
LU | 18.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
CZ | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
EE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
SK | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
RO | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
DK | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
NL | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
LV | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
SI | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
GR | 18.10.2013 | ||
ES | 28.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
FI | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
PL | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
IS | 17.11.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.07.2013 | |
BE | 17.07.2013 | ||
HR | 17.07.2013 | ||
LT | 17.07.2013 | ||
SE | 17.07.2013 | ||
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 17.07.2013 | |
NO | 17.10.2013 | ||
PT | 18.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 17.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2006100299 (MALIK RANJIT [US], et al); | [Y]EP1860471 (ROHM & HAAS [US]); | [A]WO2008132671 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [IP]WO2009147381 (CAMBRIDGE DISPLAY TECH LTD [GB], et al) | by applicant | US5703378 | US6720203 | US6740145 | US7018713 |