EP2411060 - MEDICAL DEVICES WITH GALVANIC PARTICULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.03.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Technologies and Regenerative Medicine, LLC 325 Paramount Drive Raynham, MA 02767 / US | [2012/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Chunlin 93 Mathews Farm Road Belle Mead NJ 08502 / US | 02 /
SUN, Ying 90 Woodrow Drive Belle Mead NJ 08502 / US | 03 /
CICHOCKI, Frank, R. 3104 Glen Avenue Easton PA 18045 / US | 04 /
BAR, Saumen, N. 318 Thatcher Terrace Hillsborough NJ 08844 / US | 05 /
HAUSCHILD, James, E. 7 Holmes Road Cranburry NJ 08512 / US | 06 /
HERZBERG, Uri 148 Maple Street Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | 07 /
LI, Yufu 11 Hughes Road Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | 08 /
MING, Xintian 75 Shaffer Road Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | 09 /
KONG, Wei 17 Craft Farm Drive Bridgewater NJ 08807 / US | 10 /
CHANTALAT, Jeanette 38 Haddon Ct. Pennington NJ 08648 / US | 11 /
SOUTHALL, Michael 200 Berwyn Place Lawrenceville NJ 08648 / US | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Kirsch, Susan Edith, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/12] |
Former [2012/05] | James, Anthony Christopher W.P., et al Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 10711519.8 | 25.03.2010 | WO2010US28686 | Priority number, date | US20090163928P | 27.03.2009 Original published format: US 163928 P | [2012/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010111502 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2411060 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/18, A61L15/42, A61L26/00, A61L27/30, A61L27/50, A61L29/10, A61L29/14, A61L31/08, A61L31/14, A61K6/00 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
A61L27/306 (EP,US);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
A61L29/106 (EP,US);
A61L29/14 (EP,US);
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L31/088 (EP,US);
A61L31/145 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61L2300/102 (EP,US);
A61L2300/104 (EP,US);
A61L2300/404 (EP,US);
A61L2300/41 (EP,US);
A61L2300/45 (EP,US);
A61L2300/606 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | MEDIZINPRODUKTE MIT GALVANISCHEN TEILCHEN | [2012/05] | English: | MEDICAL DEVICES WITH GALVANIC PARTICULATES | [2012/05] | French: | DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX COMPORTANT DES PARTICULES GALVANIQUES | [2012/05] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 21.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/16] | 28.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9411058 (IMPLEMED INC [US]) [A] 1-12,16,17,19-21 * page 7, line 7 - line 24; claim - *; | [AD]US6421561 (MORRIS RUSSELL L [US]) [AD] 1-12,16,17,19-21* claim - *; | [X]US2005015042 (SUN YING [US], et al) [X] 1-12,16,17,19-21 * paragraph [0171] - paragraph [0179] *; | [AD]US2005175649 (DISALVO ANTHONY L [US], et al) [AD] 1-12,16,17,19-21 * claim - *; | [X]US2007060862 (SUN YING [US], et al) [X] 1-12,16,17,19-21 * paragraph [0183] - paragraph [0192] *; | [XP]WO2009045720 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER [US], et al) [XP] 1-12,16,17,19-21 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4167416 | US5147297 | US5162043 | US5298017 | US5304403 | US5326341 | US5405317 | US5487884 | US5685837 | US5964936 | US5993526 | US6421561 | US6584349 | US6653014 | US2004138712 | US2005148996 | US2005175649 | US2006042509 | WO2006056984 | US7172812 | US2007060862 | US2007172438 | US7476221 | US7477939 | US7476222 | US7477940 | US7479133 | - HAMAMOTO Y. ET AL., EXP DERMATOL, (1993), vol. 2, pages 231 - 235 | - BELL S ET AL., CELL SIGNAL., (2003), vol. 15, no. 1, pages 1 - 7 | - CHUN KS, CARCINOGENESIS, (2004), vol. 25, pages 445 - 454 | - FENTON MJ, INT J IMMUNOPHARMACOI, (1992), vol. 14, pages 401 - 411 | - SCHREIBER J ET AL., SURGERY, (2005), vol. 138, pages 940 - 946 | - FLOURNOY DJ; ROBINSON MC., METHODS FIND EXP CLIN PHARMACOL., (1990), vol. 12, pages 541 - 544 | - MATULA C; HILDEBRANDT M; NAHLER G., J INT MED RES., (1988), vol. 16, pages 98 - 106 | - LI Y., FOOD CHEM TOXICOL., (1996), vol. 34, pages 887 - 904 | - STAMATAS GN; KOLLIAS N., J BIOMED OPT., (2004), vol. 9, pages 315 - 322 | - GOETTE DK; ODOM RB, SOUTH MED J., (1977), vol. 70, pages 620 - 622 | - YANG ET AL., MYCOPATHOLOGIA, (1999), vol. 148, pages 79 - 82 |