EP2411227 - DEVICE FOR PRODUCING BOARD BODIES WITH PRINTED SHEETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/05] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PANELS COMPRISING PRINTED SHEETS | ||
[2016/01] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hülsta-Werke Hüls GmbH & CO. KG Karl-Hüls-Strasse 1 48703 Stadtlohn / DE | For all designated states Flooring Industries Limited, SARL 10b, rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht) 8070 Bertrange / LU | [2012/18] |
Former [2012/05] | For all designated states Hülsta-Werke Hüls GmbH & CO. KG Karl-Hüls-Strasse 1 48703 Stadtlohn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TÜNTE, Udo Dückerstrasse 7 46348 Raesfeld / DE | 02 /
PETERSEN, Frank Timphorst 29 48653 Raesfeld / DE | [2012/05] | Representative(s) | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/03] | Von Rohr Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Rüttenscheider Straße 62 45130 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2012/05] | Gesthuysen, von Rohr & Eggert Patentanwälte Huyssenallee 100 45128 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10711539.6 | 05.02.2010 | WO2010EP00741 | Priority number, date | EP20090004181 | 24.03.2009 Original published format: EP 09004181 | EP20090005987 | 30.04.2009 Original published format: EP 09005987 | [2012/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010108569 | Date: | 30.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2411227 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.09.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B41C1/04, B44C5/04, H04N1/60, B41F11/00, B41F9/02, B32B13/02, B32B13/08, B32B21/06, B32B27/10, B32B21/02, B32B29/00, B32B38/14, B41M1/10, B41M1/24, E04F15/02 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B41F9/021 (EP);
B32B13/02 (EP);
B32B13/08 (EP);
B32B21/02 (EP);
B32B21/06 (EP);
B32B27/10 (EP);
B32B29/002 (EP);
B32B38/145 (EP);
B41F11/00 (EP);
B41M1/10 (EP);
B41M1/24 (EP);
B44C5/04 (EP);
B44C5/0469 (EP);
E04F15/02 (EP);
B32B2260/028 (EP);
B32B2260/046 (EP);
B32B2307/4023 (EP);
B32B2307/58 (EP);
B32B2307/75 (EP);
B32B2317/125 (EP);
B32B2317/16 (EP);
B32B2419/00 (EP);
B32B2471/00 (EP);
B32B2479/00 (EP);
B32B2607/00 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/05] | B41C1/04, B44C5/04, H04N1/60, B41F11/00, B41F9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/05] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTENKÖRPERN MIT BEDRUCKTEN DRUCKBÖGEN | [2016/01] | English: | DEVICE FOR PRODUCING BOARD BODIES WITH PRINTED SHEETS | [2016/03] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA FABRICATION DE CORPS DE PLAQUES DOTÉS DE FEUILLES IMPRIMÉES | [2016/03] |
Former [2012/05] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PLATTENKÖRPERN MIT BEDRUCKTEN DRUCKBÖGEN | ||
Former [2012/05] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING PANELS COMPRISING PRINTED SHEETS | ||
Former [2012/05] | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CORPS EN FORME DE PLAQUE COMPRENANT DES FEUILLES IMPRIMÉES | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2011 | Examination requested [2012/05] | 15.05.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/43] | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0675636 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1,3-8,10 * column 1, line 14 - column 2, line 43 * * column 6, line 31 - column 7, line 34; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0737570 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,14 * column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 21 ** column 4, lines 23-53; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE19947397 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1,10,14 * column 1, lines 3-31; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 38-46 *; | [Y]DE19963084 (BORNSCHLEGEL BERND [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 1, lines 13-25 * * column 1, lines 60-68 *; | [Y]EP1858244 (FLOORING TECHNOLOGIES LTD [MT]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] - [0019] - [0025] , [0030] - [0033] *; | [Y]WO2008110275 (HUELSTA WERKE HUELS KG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, lines 4-19 * * page 7, lines 9-19 * * page 9, lines 7-10 * * page 13, lines 12-16 * * page 15, lines 4-28 *; | [T] - RODRIGUEZ M ED - INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, "A graphic arts perspective on RGB-to-CMYK conversion", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. (ICIP). WASHINGTON, OCT. 23 - 26, 1995; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING. (ICIP)], LOS ALAMITOS, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US LNKD- DOI:10.1109/ICIP.1995.53, (19951023), vol. 2, ISBN 978-0-7803-3122-8, pages 319 - 322, XP010197089 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.1995.537479 |