EP2414067 - DEVICE FOR SEPARATING INTO FRACTIONS A FLUID COMPRISING SEVERAL FRACTIONS WITH DOUBLE SEPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES & INNOVATIONS B.V. Leemansweg 11 6827 BX Arnhem / NL | [2013/17] |
Former [2012/11] | For all designated states Taxon B.V. Schottegatweg Oost 32 Willemstad, Curaçao / AN | ||
Former [2012/06] | For all designated states Advanced Tail-End Oil Company N.V. Schottegatweg Oost 32 Willemstad, Curaçao / AN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOOK, Robert De Eiken 21 NL-7221 GJ Steenderen / NL | [2012/06] | Representative(s) | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk BV P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/06] | Van den Heuvel, Henricus Theodorus Patentwerk BV P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 10712179.0 | 02.04.2010 | WO2010NL50172 | Priority number, date | NL20092002714 | 03.04.2009 Original published format: NL 2002714 | [2012/06] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010114377 | Date: | 07.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2414067 | Date: | 08.02.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.10.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2414067 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D45/12, B01D45/16, B01D17/02 | [2012/06] | CPC: |
B01D17/0217 (EP,US);
B01D45/16 (EP,US);
B04C3/00 (EP,US);
B04C3/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR TRENNUNG EINES MEHRERE FRAKTIONEN UMFASSENDEN FLUIDS IN FRAKTIONEN MIT DOPPELTRENNUNG | [2012/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR SEPARATING INTO FRACTIONS A FLUID COMPRISING SEVERAL FRACTIONS WITH DOUBLE SEPARATION | [2012/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION EN FRACTIONS D'UN FLUIDE COMPRENANT PLUSIEURS FRACTIONS AVEC UNE DOUBLE SÉPARATION | [2012/06] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/06] | 25.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.04.2010 | AT | 02.04.2014 | CY | 02.04.2014 | CZ | 02.04.2014 | EE | 02.04.2014 | FI | 02.04.2014 | HR | 02.04.2014 | IE | 02.04.2014 | LT | 02.04.2014 | LU | 02.04.2014 | LV | 02.04.2014 | MC | 02.04.2014 | MK | 02.04.2014 | MT | 02.04.2014 | PL | 02.04.2014 | RO | 02.04.2014 | SE | 02.04.2014 | SI | 02.04.2014 | SK | 02.04.2014 | SM | 02.04.2014 | TR | 02.04.2014 | CH | 30.04.2014 | LI | 30.04.2014 | BG | 02.07.2014 | GR | 03.07.2014 | IS | 02.08.2014 | PT | 04.08.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 02.04.2010 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LU | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
TR | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 02.04.2010 | |
AT | 02.04.2014 | ||
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
SM | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
MT | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
MC | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SI | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
IE | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
RO | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
EE | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
SK | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
CH | 30.04.2014 | ||
LI | 30.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
PT | 04.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 02.04.2014 | |
CY | 02.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
HR | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
LV | 02.04.2014 | ||
PL | 02.04.2014 | ||
SE | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
GR | 03.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
FI | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
IS | 02.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 02.04.2014 | |
CZ | 02.04.2014 | ||
LT | 02.04.2014 | ||
BG | 02.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 02.04.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3641745 (MOORE LESTER P) [X] 17 * abstract * * column 2, line 25 - column 5, line 22 * [I] 1-10; | [A]FR2111500 (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-18 * page 4, line 3 - line 25; figures 1,2; claims 1-6 *; | [XI]US4478712 (ARNAUDEAU MARCEL [FR]) [X] 17 * abstract * * column 1, line 52 - column 3, line 16 * * column 3, line 39 - column 6, line 2 * [I] 1,3,4,11-16,18; | [A]EP0776686 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1-18 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 40 *; | [A]US2002174773 (CHENG KUAI-CHUNG [TW]) [A] 1-18 * abstract *; | [A]US2003159412 (NORTH JOHN HERBERT [GB]) [A] 1-18* abstract * |